EP2461101 - Burner device for a gas turbine assembly and method for operating the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.05.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.06.2013 [2013/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2013/11] |
Former [2012/23] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaufmann, Carsten / Baakendorfer Str. 34 45478, Mülheim a.d. Ruhr / DE | 02 /
Kock, Boris Ferdinand / Gerhardstrasse 11 40878, Ratingen / DE | 03 /
Köstlin, Berthold / Lotharstr. 154 47057, Duisburg / DE | 04 /
Meisl, Jürgen / Prinzenhöhe 47 45478, Mülheim an der Ruhr / DE | 05 /
Teteruk, Rostislav / Scharpenberg 64 A 45468, Mülheim an der Ruhr / DE | [2012/23] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/23] | Application number, filing date | 10193575.7 | 03.12.2010 | [2012/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2461101 | Date: | 06.06.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F23R3/14, F23R3/36, F02C9/40 | [2012/23] | CPC: |
F23R3/36 (EP);
F02C9/40 (EP);
F23R3/14 (EP);
F05D2260/14 (EP);
F23N2237/08 (EP);
F23R2900/00002 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Brennereinrichtung für eine Gasturbinenanlage und Verfahren zum Betreiben einer derartigen Brennereinrichtung | [2012/23] | English: | Burner device for a gas turbine assembly and method for operating the same | [2012/23] | French: | Dispositif de brûleur pour une installation de turbine à gaz et procédé de fonctionnement d'un tel dispositif de brûleur | [2012/23] | Examination procedure | 07.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/24] | 23.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/24] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP2161502 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 1-11 * paragraphs [0004] , [ 0013] , [ 0015] * * paragraphs [0022] , [ 0035] , [ 0037]; figures 1b, 3, 4 *; | [Y]US2008083229 (HAYNES JOEL MEIER [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * paragraphs [0023] , [ 0025] , [ 0026] * * paragraphs [0028] , [ 0032] , [ 0035] * * paragraphs [0036] , [ 0037] , [ 0040]; figures 1-8 *; | [A]EP1645804 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,9-11 * paragraphs [0009] , [ 0012] - paragraph [0014]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE102008002941 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1,9,11 * paragraphs [0005] , [ 0006] , [ 0016] *; | [A]US6904873 (ASHTON LARRY J [US]) [A] 2,3 * column 1, line 38 - line 49 * * column 3, line 3 - line 33; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE102009026400 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 2,3 * paragraph [0034]; figures 1, 4 *; | [A]EP2204563 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1,5,9 * paragraphs [0009] , [ 0018] , [ 0020] , [ 0021] * * paragraphs [0027] , [ 0028] , [ 0034] , [ 0035]; figures 1-3 * |