EP2333707 - Method and apparatus for providing electronic phonebook [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.07.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 09.08.2017 [2017/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/38] |
Former [2011/24] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jeon, Jae Choon C/O Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Kim, Bum Soo C/O Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2011/24] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2013/28] |
Former [2012/04] | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau J.W. Frisolaan 13 2517 JS Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2011/24] | van Westenbrugge, Andries Nederlandsch Octrooibureau J.W. Frisolaan 13 2517 JS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 10194097.1 | 08.12.2010 | [2011/24] | Priority number, date | KR20090121312 | 08.12.2009 Original published format: KR 20090121312 | [2011/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2333707 | Date: | 15.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00 | [2011/24] | CPC: |
G06Q10/10 (EP,US);
H04B1/40 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bereitstellung eines elektronischen Telefonbuchs | [2011/24] | English: | Method and apparatus for providing electronic phonebook | [2011/24] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour fournir un annuaire électronique | [2011/24] | Examination procedure | 14.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/04] | 05.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.12.2016 | 14.12.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 09.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/32] | 19.03.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.11.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2016 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [L] - EPO, "Mitteilung des Europäischen Patentamts vom 1. Oktober 2007 über Geschäftsmethoden = Notice from the European Patent Office dated 1 October 2007 concerning business methods = Communiqué de l'Office européen des brevets,en date du 1er octobre 2007, concernant les méthodes dans le domaine des activités", JOURNAL OFFICIEL DE L'OFFICE EUROPEEN DES BREVETS.OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT OFFICE.AMTSBLATTT DES EUROPAEISCHEN PATENTAMTS, OEB, MUNCHEN, DE, (20071101), vol. 30, no. 11, ISSN 0170-9291, pages 592 - 593, XP007905525 [L] 1-15 * The claimed subject matter, with due regard to the description and drawings, relates to processes comprised in the list of subject matter and activities excluded from patentability under Art.52(2) and (3) EPC. The applicant is advised that in accordance with the established practice of the EPO, no search need be performed in respect of those aspects of the claimed invention. The only identifiable technical aspects of the claimed invention relate to the use of conventional, general-purpose data processing technology for processing data of an inherently non-technical nature. The information technology employed is considered to have been generally known as it was widely available to everyone at the date of filing/priority of the present application. The notoriety of such prior art cannot reasonably be contested. No documentary evidence was therefore considered required. * | Examination | US2007004390 |