EP2341367 - Method and assembly for detecting traffic violations in an area with traffic lights [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.01.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JENOPTIK Robot GmbH Opladener Strasse 202 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [2011/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Epp, Viktor Hauptstrasse 39 53842 Troisdorf / DE | 02 /
Pessara, Markus Glockenblumenweg 54 51061 Köln / DE | [2017/07] |
Former [2011/27] | 01 /
Epp, Viktor Hauptstrasse 39 53842 Troisdorf / DE | ||
02 /
Pessara, Markus Glockenblumenweg 54 51061 Köln / DE | Representative(s) | Schaller, Renate, et al Gleim Petri Oehmke Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Neugasse 13 07743 Jena / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/07] | Schaller, Renate, et al Patentanwälte Oehmke & Kollegen Neugasse 13 07743 Jena / DE | ||
Former [2011/27] | Schaller, Renate, et al Patentanwälte Oehmke & Kollegen Neugasse 13 07743 Jena / DE | Application number, filing date | 10194222.5 | 08.12.2010 | [2011/27] | Priority number, date | DE20091060499 | 22.12.2009 Original published format: DE102009060499 | [2011/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2341367 | Date: | 06.07.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2341367 | Date: | 29.02.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2341367 | Date: | 15.02.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/86, G01S13/91, G01S17/02, G08G1/017, G08G1/04, G08G1/054, // G01S13/42, G01S13/58 | [2012/09] | CPC: |
G01S13/91 (EP,US);
G01S13/865 (EP);
G01S13/867 (EP);
G01S17/04 (EP);
G08G1/0175 (EP);
G08G1/054 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2011/27] | G01S13/86, G01S13/91, G01S17/02, G08G1/017, G08G1/04, G08G1/054, G01S13/42, G01S13/58, // G01S13/42, G01S13/58 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/07] |
Former [2011/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anordnung zur Erfassung von Verkehrsverstößen in einem Ampelbereich | [2011/27] | English: | Method and assembly for detecting traffic violations in an area with traffic lights | [2011/27] | French: | Procédé et agencement de détection des infractions au code de la route dans une zone de feux de signalisation | [2011/27] | Examination procedure | 20.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/39] | 24.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 11.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | 16.11.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.12.2010 | AL | 15.02.2017 | CY | 15.02.2017 | CZ | 15.02.2017 | DK | 15.02.2017 | EE | 15.02.2017 | ES | 15.02.2017 | FI | 15.02.2017 | HR | 15.02.2017 | IT | 15.02.2017 | LT | 15.02.2017 | LV | 15.02.2017 | MC | 15.02.2017 | MK | 15.02.2017 | MT | 15.02.2017 | PL | 15.02.2017 | RO | 15.02.2017 | RS | 15.02.2017 | SE | 15.02.2017 | SI | 15.02.2017 | SK | 15.02.2017 | SM | 15.02.2017 | TR | 15.02.2017 | BG | 15.05.2017 | NO | 15.05.2017 | GR | 16.05.2017 | IS | 15.06.2017 | PT | 15.06.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 08.12.2010 | |
CY | 15.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
MK | 15.02.2017 | ||
MT | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
TR | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 08.12.2010 | |
CY | 15.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
MK | 15.02.2017 | ||
MT | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 08.12.2010 | |
CY | 15.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
MT | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 08.12.2010 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
MT | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | CZ | 15.02.2017 | |
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
MT | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 15.02.2017 | |
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MT | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | CZ | 15.02.2017 | |
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 15.02.2017 | |
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | CZ | 15.02.2017 | |
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 15.02.2017 | |
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 15.02.2017 | |
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | ES | 15.02.2017 | |
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
RS | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2004222904 (CIOLLI ROBERT [AU]) [Y] 7-11 * the whole document * [A] 1-6; | [YDA]EP1454164 (KAPSCH TRAFFICCOM AG [AT]) [YD] 7,11 * the whole document * [A] 1-6,8-10; | [A]WO2005122104 (ROBOT VISUAL SYSTEMS GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [YDA]EP2048515 (ROBOT VISUAL SYSTEMS GMBH [DE]) [YD] 7-11 * the whole document * [A] 1-6; | [A]EP2068291 (ROBOT VISUAL SYSTEMS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-11* the whole document * | by applicant | EP1454164 | EP2048515 |