EP2336180 - Antibody specifically binding to angiopoietin-2 and use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 22.04.2016 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 25.05.2016 [2016/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/39] |
Former [2011/25] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 506-762 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ryu, Jong-sang c/o Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology, San 14-1 Nongseo-dong, Giheung-gu, Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Min, Brian Ho-sung c/o Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology, San 14-1 Nongseo-dong, Giheung-gu, Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Cho, A-yeon c/o Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology, San 14-1 Nongseo-dong, Giheung-gu, Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Kim, Min-kyung c/o Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology, San 14-1 Nongseo-dong, Giheung-gu, Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2011/25] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/25] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10194248.0 | 09.12.2010 | [2011/25] | Priority number, date | KR20090125035 | 15.12.2009 Original published format: KR 20090125035 | [2011/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2336180 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/22, A61P35/00, A61K39/395 | [2011/25] | CPC: |
C07K16/22 (EP,US);
C07K16/30 (KR);
A61K39/395 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
C12N15/63 (KR);
C07K2317/24 (EP,US);
C07K2317/73 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/76 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/92 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Spezifisch an Angiopoietin-2 bindender Antikörper und Verwendung dafür | [2011/25] | English: | Antibody specifically binding to angiopoietin-2 and use thereof | [2011/25] | French: | Anticorps se liant spécifiquement à l'angiopoietine-2 et utilisation correspondante | [2011/25] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 22.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/08] | 06.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.12.2015 | 18.12.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 07.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/21] | 17.01.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.05.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2015 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO03030833 (AMGEN INC [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * page 85 - page 90; example 4 * * page 100; table 9 * * figure 2 * * page 101, line 11 - line 25 * * page 62, line 15 - line 25 *; | [I]WO2006068953 (ABGENIX INC [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 62 - page 63; example 4 * * page 120, paragraph 0309 - page 123, paragraph 0319 * * page 122; table 18 * * page 123, paragraph 0321 - page 125, paragraph 0325 *; | [I]WO2009097325 (MEDIMMUNE LTD [GB], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 15, paragraph 067 * * page 102 - page 1; example 9 * * page 103 - page 104; example 10 * * page 8, paragraph 031 *; | [I] - OLINER J ET AL, "Suppression of angiogenesis and tumor growth by selective inhibition of angiopoietin-2", CANCER CELL, CELL PRESS, US, (20041101), vol. 6, no. 5, doi:10.1016/J.CCR.2004.09.030, ISSN 1535-6108, pages 507 - 516, XP002348738 [I] 1-14 * page 508, column r, paragraph 2 * * page 508, column r, paragraph 4 - page 509, column l * * page 509, column r, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ccr.2004.09.030 | [I] - CAI M ET AL, "Single chain Fv antibody against angiopoietin-2 inhibits VEGF-induced endothelial cell proliferation and migration in vitro", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, US, (20031003), vol. 309, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.BBRC.2003.08.086, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 946 - 951, XP004455833 [I] 1-14 * abstract * * page 947, column l, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbrc.2003.08.086 | [I] - WANG HONG-LING ET AL, "[Effects of anti-angiopoietin-2 antibody on vascularization of an implanted model of human colonic carcinoma on chick embryo].", MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE (NLM), BETHESDA, MD, US, (200705), Database accession no. NLM17520390, XP002631400 [I] 1-14 * abstract * | [ ] - ZHONGHUA WEI CHANG WAI KE ZA ZHI = CHINESE JOURNAL OF GASTROINTESTINAL SURGERY, (200705), vol. 10, no. 3, ISSN 1671-0274, pages 278 - 280 | [A] - HU BO ET AL, "Angiopoietin-2: development of inhibitors for cancer therapy.", CURRENT ONCOLOGY REPORTS, (200903), vol. 11, no. 2, ISSN 1534-6269, pages 111 - 116, XP002631399 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * * in particular; page 114, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11912-009-0017-3 |