EP2323427 - Cell selection method and mobile station [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 16.07.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/20] | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iwamura, Mikio c/o NTT DOCOMO, INC. Intellectual Property Dept. S Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
Nakamura, Takehiro c/o NTT DOCOMO, INC. Intellectual Property Dept. S Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2011/20] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/20] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10194507.9 | 14.11.2008 | [2011/20] | Priority number, date | JP20070298714 | 16.11.2007 Original published format: JP 2007298714 | JP20080243401 | 22.09.2008 Original published format: JP 2008243401 | [2011/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2323427 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/00, H04W16/00, H04W48/06 | [2011/20] | CPC: |
H04W60/04 (EP,KR,US);
H04W36/30 (KR);
H04W48/06 (EP,KR,US);
H04W48/20 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/20] | Title | German: | Zellenauswahl Verhahren und Mobilstation | [2011/20] | English: | Cell selection method and mobile station | [2011/20] | French: | Procédé de sélection de cellule et station mobile | [2011/20] | Examination procedure | 07.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/34] | 08.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 02.02.2021 | 02.02.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 31.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/33] | 10.04.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/33] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08849350.7 / EP2222098 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080849350) is 30.08.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2315193 (ORANGE PERSONAL COMM SERV LTD [GB]) [A] 1,2 * page 7, line 5 - line 18; figures 7,8; claim 7 * * page 13, line 1 - line 4 * * page 18, line 8 - page 20, line 20 ** page 26, line 1 - line 5 *; | [X]US2006160541 (RYU DONG-WON [KR]) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [X] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; User Equipment (UE) procedures in idle mode and procedures for cell reselection in connected mode (Release 7)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 25.304, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20070901), no. V7.3.0, pages 1 - 41, XP050367385 [X] 1,2 * §5.2.6.1.1, 5.2.6.1.4, 5.2.6.1.5 * | [X] - NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS ET AL, "E-UTRA Measurements and Cell Reselection Considerations", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-072386 E-UTRA MEASUREMENTS AND CELL RESELECTION CONSIDERATIONS, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20070622), vol. RAN WG2, no. Orlando, USA; 20070622, XP050135231 [X] 1,2 * the whole document * | Examination | - NOKIA ET AL, "E-UTRA Inter-Frequency Cell Reselection Aspects", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-074880 E-UTRA CELL INTER-FREQUENCY RESELECTIONS, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20071030), vol. RAN WG2, no. Jeju; 20071030, XP050137383 | by applicant | JP2008243401 |