EP2335557 - Method for checking an optical inspection system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Karl Storz GmbH & Co. KG Mittelstraße 8 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/25] | For all designated states Karl Storz GmbH & Co. KG Mittelstraße 8 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beck, Gerd c/o Karl Storz GmbH & Co. KG Mittelstraße 8 78532, Tuttlingen / DE | 02 /
Ehrhardt, André c/o Karl Storz GmbH & Co. KG Mittelstraße 8 78532, Tuttlingen / DE | 03 /
Martin, Uwe c/o Karl Storz GmbH & Co. KG Mittelstraße 8 78532, Tuttlingen / DE | 04 /
Glöggler, Bernhard c/o Karl Storz GmbH & Co. KG Mittelstraße 8 78532, Tuttlingen / DE | 05 /
Schachenmayr, Hilmar c/o Karl Storz GmbH & Co. KG Mittelstraße 8 78532, Tuttlingen / DE | 06 /
Kennedy, Bryan c/o Karl Storz GmbH & Co. KG Mittelstraße 8 78532, Tuttlingen / DE | 07 /
Coussa, Raymond c/o Karl Storz GmbH & Co. KG Mittelstraße 8 78532, Tuttlingen / DE | 08 /
Tang, Nathan c/o Karl Storz GmbH & Co. KG Mittelstraße 8 78532, Tuttlingen / DE | [2015/17] |
Former [2011/25] | 01 /
Beck, Gerd c/o Karl Storz GmbH & Co. KG Mittelstraße 8 78532, Tuttlingen / DE | ||
02 /
Ehrhardt, André c/o Karl Storz GmbH & Co. KG Mittelstraße 8 78532, Tuttlingen / DE | |||
03 /
Martin, Uwe c/o Karl Storz GmbH & Co. KG Mittelstraße 8 78532, Tuttlingen / DE | |||
04 /
Glöggler, Bernhard c/o Karl Storz GmbH & Co. KG Mittelstraße 8 78532, Tuttlingen / DE | |||
05 /
Schachenmayr, Hilmar c/o Karl Storz GmbH & Co. KG Mittelstraße 8 78532, Tuttlingen / DE | |||
06 /
Kennedy, Bryan c/o Karl Storz GmbH & Co. KG Mittelstraße 8 78532, Tuttlingen / DE | |||
07 /
Coussa, Raymond c/o Karl Storz GmbH & Co. KG Mittelstraße 8 78532, Tuttlingen / DE | |||
08 /
Tang, Nathan c/o Karl Storz GmbH & Co. KG Mittelstraße 8 78532, Tuttlingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 10194653.1 | 13.12.2010 | [2011/25] | Priority number, date | DE20091058662 | 16.12.2009 Original published format: DE102009058662 | [2011/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2335557 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2335557 | Date: | 22.04.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/04, G01N21/27, A61B5/00, A61B5/1495, G01N21/64, A61B1/00 | [2014/52] | CPC: |
A61B1/00057 (EP,US);
A61B1/00186 (EP);
A61B1/043 (EP,US);
A61B5/0059 (EP,US);
A61B5/1495 (EP,US);
G01N21/274 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/25] | A61B1/00, A61B5/00, A61B5/1495, G01N21/64 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/17] |
Former [2011/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Prüfen eines optischen Untersuchungssystems | [2011/25] | English: | Method for checking an optical inspection system | [2011/25] | French: | Procédé de contrôle d'un système d'analyse optique | [2011/25] | Examination procedure | 08.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/03] | 20.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.01.2015 | Opposition(s) | 25.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.12.2010 | AL | 22.04.2015 | BG | 22.04.2015 | CY | 22.04.2015 | CZ | 22.04.2015 | DK | 22.04.2015 | EE | 22.04.2015 | ES | 22.04.2015 | FI | 22.04.2015 | HR | 22.04.2015 | LT | 22.04.2015 | LV | 22.04.2015 | MC | 22.04.2015 | MK | 22.04.2015 | MT | 22.04.2015 | NL | 22.04.2015 | PL | 22.04.2015 | RO | 22.04.2015 | RS | 22.04.2015 | SE | 22.04.2015 | SI | 22.04.2015 | SK | 22.04.2015 | SM | 22.04.2015 | TR | 22.04.2015 | NO | 22.07.2015 | GR | 23.07.2015 | IS | 22.08.2015 | PT | 24.08.2015 | AT | 13.12.2015 | IE | 13.12.2015 | LU | 13.12.2015 | BE | 31.12.2015 | CH | 31.12.2015 | LI | 31.12.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 13.12.2010 | |
BG | 22.04.2015 | ||
CY | 22.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
MK | 22.04.2015 | ||
MT | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
RS | 22.04.2015 | ||
SE | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
SM | 22.04.2015 | ||
TR | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
AT | 13.12.2015 | ||
IE | 13.12.2015 | ||
LU | 13.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 13.12.2010 | |
BG | 22.04.2015 | ||
CY | 22.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
MT | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
RS | 22.04.2015 | ||
SE | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
SM | 22.04.2015 | ||
TR | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
AT | 13.12.2015 | ||
IE | 13.12.2015 | ||
LU | 13.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/36] | HU | 13.12.2010 | |
BG | 22.04.2015 | ||
CY | 22.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
MT | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
RS | 22.04.2015 | ||
SE | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
SM | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
AT | 13.12.2015 | ||
IE | 13.12.2015 | ||
LU | 13.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/46] | CZ | 22.04.2015 | |
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
RS | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
IE | 13.12.2015 | ||
LU | 13.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | CZ | 22.04.2015 | |
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
RS | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
IE | 13.12.2015 | ||
LU | 13.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 22.04.2015 | |
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
RS | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
LU | 13.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | CZ | 22.04.2015 | |
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
RS | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 22.04.2015 | |
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
RS | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 22.04.2015 | |
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
RS | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | DK | 22.04.2015 | |
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RS | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | DK | 22.04.2015 | |
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RS | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 22.04.2015 | |
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RS | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 22.04.2015 | |
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RS | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/42] | NL | 22.04.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]DE19638809 (STORZ KARL GMBH & CO [DE]) [YD] 1-13 * abstract * * column 2, line 44 - column 4, line 21 * * column 5, line 14 - column 6, line 7 * * column 7, line 24 - line 33 * * column 7, line 62 - line 67 *; | [A]US2003078477 (KANG UK [KR], et al) [A] 1-13* the whole document *; | [Y]US2003105195 (HOLCOMB NELSON R [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0053] * * claims 42,43 *; | [A]EP1728464 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP [JP]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0077] * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]US2007012885 (MONTAGU JEAN I [US]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * claims 9-12 * | by applicant | DE19638809 | DE19855853 |