EP2338384 - Rack display unit for products in general, with improved elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.10.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.11.2016 [2016/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pasolini Luigi S.p.A. Via G. Di Vittorio, 12 25030 Castelmella (BS) / IT | [2011/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lucchini, Maurizio Via della Cudula, 25/B 25164, GUSSAGO BS / IT | [2011/26] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2011/26] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 10194799.2 | 13.12.2010 | [2011/26] | Priority number, date | IT2009MI00423U | 22.12.2009 Original published format: IT MI20090423 U | [2011/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2338384 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A47F5/00, A47F5/08, G09F3/20 | [2011/26] | CPC: |
A47F1/126 (EP);
A47F5/083 (EP);
A47F5/0869 (EP);
G09F3/204 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Ständeranzeigeeinheit für Produkte im Allgemeinen mit verbesserten Elementen | [2011/26] | English: | Rack display unit for products in general, with improved elements | [2011/26] | French: | Unité d'affichage d'étagère pour produits en général, avec éléments améliorés | [2011/26] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/05] | 01.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/48] | 27.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2012 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.06.2013 | 31.12.2014 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   20.02.2015 | 31.12.2015 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2190280 (CBM DISPLAY GROUP LTD) [X] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0531034 (EML LTD [GB]) [X] 1-6* the whole document *; | [X]US2005072747 (ROSLOF JAMES P [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1560189 (DRIVER [FR]) [X] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [X]US2006086680 (BURKE ROBERT P [US]) [X] 1-6 * the whole document * |