EP2339255 - Method for optimised control of a temperature control device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.06.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electricité de France 22-30 avenue de Wagram 75008 Paris / FR | [2011/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barbouchi, Sami 11 rue Riquet Bat B 75019 Paris / FR | 02 /
Coince, Anne-Sophie 4 résidence Bernard Palissi Bat 4 77210 Avon / FR | [2016/32] |
Former [2011/26] | 01 /
Barbouchi, Sami 11 rue Riquet Bat B 75019 Paris / FR | ||
02 /
Coince, Anne-Sophie 4 résidence Bernard Palissi Bat 4 77210 Avon / FR | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/32] | Cabinet Plasseraud 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2011/26] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 10194857.8 | 14.12.2010 | [2011/26] | Priority number, date | FR20090059079 | 16.12.2009 Original published format: FR 0959079 | [2011/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2339255 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2339255 | Date: | 10.08.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F24F11/00, G05D23/19 | [2011/26] | CPC: |
G05D23/1923 (EP);
F24F11/62 (EP,US);
F24D19/1039 (EP,US);
F24F11/30 (EP);
F24H15/156 (EP,US);
F24H15/176 (EP,US);
F24H15/258 (EP,US);
F24H15/375 (EP,US);
F25B49/02 (EP);
F24F11/46 (EP);
F24F11/61 (EP);
F24F11/64 (EP);
F24F2130/00 (EP);
F24F2130/10 (EP);
F24F2140/60 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/32] |
Former [2011/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur optimierten Steuerung eines Temperaturreglers | [2011/26] | English: | Method for optimised control of a temperature control device | [2011/26] | French: | Procédé de contrôle optimisé d'un dispositif de régulation en température | [2011/26] | Examination procedure | 08.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/37] | 21.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.09.2012 | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.12.2010 | AL | 10.08.2016 | AT | 10.08.2016 | CY | 10.08.2016 | CZ | 10.08.2016 | DK | 10.08.2016 | EE | 10.08.2016 | ES | 10.08.2016 | FI | 10.08.2016 | HR | 10.08.2016 | IT | 10.08.2016 | LT | 10.08.2016 | LV | 10.08.2016 | MC | 10.08.2016 | MK | 10.08.2016 | MT | 10.08.2016 | NL | 10.08.2016 | PL | 10.08.2016 | RO | 10.08.2016 | RS | 10.08.2016 | SE | 10.08.2016 | SI | 10.08.2016 | SK | 10.08.2016 | SM | 10.08.2016 | TR | 10.08.2016 | BG | 10.11.2016 | NO | 10.11.2016 | GR | 11.11.2016 | IS | 10.12.2016 | PT | 12.12.2016 | GB | 14.12.2016 | IE | 14.12.2016 | LU | 14.12.2016 | BE | 31.12.2016 | CH | 31.12.2016 | LI | 31.12.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/43] | HU | 14.12.2010 | |
AT | 10.08.2016 | ||
CY | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
MK | 10.08.2016 | ||
MT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
TR | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
GB | 14.12.2016 | ||
IE | 14.12.2016 | ||
LU | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 14.12.2010 | |
AT | 10.08.2016 | ||
CY | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
MK | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
TR | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
GB | 14.12.2016 | ||
IE | 14.12.2016 | ||
LU | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 14.12.2010 | |
AT | 10.08.2016 | ||
CY | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
MK | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
GB | 14.12.2016 | ||
IE | 14.12.2016 | ||
LU | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
GB | 14.12.2016 | ||
IE | 14.12.2016 | ||
LU | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
IE | 14.12.2016 | ||
LU | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/45] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 10.08.2016 | |
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 10.08.2016 | |
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 10.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2278207 (EA TECH LTD [GB]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [X]EP0688085 (SCHLUMBERGER IND SA [FR]) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2793643 (DELTA DORE [FR]) [X] 1,5,7-15 * abstract * * page 2, line 1 - page 6, line 7 *; | [X]US2005005621 (JAYADEV TUMKUR S [US]) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2866944 (TANTOT FLORENCE [FR]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |