EP2320683 - Sound tuning method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2018 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Harman Becker Automotive Systems GmbH Becker-Göring-Strasse 16 76307 Karlsbad / DE | [2011/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Christoph, Markus Danziger Str. 46 94315, Straubing / DE | 02 /
Scholz, Leander Bergschneider Str. 5 94330, Salching / DE | [2017/36] |
Former [2011/19] | 01 /
Christoph, Markus Danziger Str. 46 94315, Straubing / DE | ||
02 /
Scholz, Leander Bergschneider Str. 5 94330, Salching / DE | Representative(s) | Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Werinherstrasse 79 81541 München / DE | [2017/36] |
Former [2011/19] | Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Herzog-Wilhelm-Strasse 26 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10195233.1 | 25.04.2007 | [2011/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2320683 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2320683 | Date: | 08.06.2011 | [2011/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2320683 | Date: | 06.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04S7/00, H04R3/14, H03G3/32, H03G5/00, H03G9/00 | [2017/19] | CPC: |
H03G5/005 (EP,US);
H04S5/00 (KR);
H03G3/32 (EP,US);
H03G9/005 (EP,US);
H04R3/14 (EP,US);
H04S7/301 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/19] | H04S7/00, // H04R3/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/36] |
Former [2011/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Klangabstimmung | [2011/19] | English: | Sound tuning method and apparatus | [2011/19] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour le réglage du son | [2011/19] | Examination procedure | 05.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/03] | 11.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07008457.9 / EP1986466 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070008457) is 15.12.2008 | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2011 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   25.05.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.04.2007 | AT | 06.09.2017 | CY | 06.09.2017 | CZ | 06.09.2017 | DK | 06.09.2017 | EE | 06.09.2017 | ES | 06.09.2017 | FI | 06.09.2017 | IT | 06.09.2017 | LT | 06.09.2017 | LV | 06.09.2017 | MC | 06.09.2017 | NL | 06.09.2017 | PL | 06.09.2017 | PT | 06.09.2017 | RO | 06.09.2017 | SE | 06.09.2017 | SI | 06.09.2017 | SK | 06.09.2017 | TR | 06.09.2017 | BG | 06.12.2017 | GR | 07.12.2017 | IS | 06.01.2018 | IE | 25.04.2018 | LU | 25.04.2018 | MT | 25.04.2018 | BE | 30.04.2018 | CH | 30.04.2018 | FR | 30.04.2018 | LI | 30.04.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 25.04.2007 | |
AT | 06.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PT | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
TR | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
IE | 25.04.2018 | ||
LU | 25.04.2018 | ||
MT | 25.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
FR | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
TR | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
IE | 25.04.2018 | ||
LU | 25.04.2018 | ||
MT | 25.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
FR | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
IE | 25.04.2018 | ||
LU | 25.04.2018 | ||
MT | 25.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
FR | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
IE | 25.04.2018 | ||
LU | 25.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
FR | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
IE | 25.04.2018 | ||
LU | 25.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
LU | 25.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
LU | 25.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 06.09.2017 | |
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/15] | ES | 06.09.2017 | |
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | ES | 06.09.2017 | |
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 06.09.2017 | |
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 06.09.2017 | |
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 06.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]FR2890280 (ELSI INGENIERIE SARL [FR]) [X] 1,2,4,6,7,11-14 * the whole document * [Y] 3,5,6,8,9,15 [I] 3,10; | [Y]US5384856 (KYOUNO NOBORU [JP], et al) [Y] 5,6,15 * column 1, lines 5,6,65 - column 2, line 18 * * column 3, line 1 - column 7, line 24; figures 1-8 *; | [A]US2007025559 (MIHELICH RYAN J [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [Y] - ROBERT ARNAUD ET AL, "A composite model of the auditory periphery for simulating responses to complex sounds", JOURNAL OF THE ACOUSTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, AIP / ACOUSTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, MELVILLE, NY, US, (199910), vol. 106, no. 4, ISSN 0001-4966, pages 1852 - 1864, XP012001237 [Y] 3 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1121/1.427935 | [Y] - "PIONEER ELITE REFERENCE RECEIVER GETS TECHNOLOGY UPDATE", INTERNET CITATION, (20030905), XP002383841 [Y] 8,9 * the whole document * | by applicant | - B. MOORE; B. GLASBERG, "Suggested formulae for calculating auditory filter bandwidths and excitation patterns", JOURNAL OF THE ACOUSTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, (1983), vol. 74, pages 750 - 753 | - "A Functional Model of Neural Activity Patterns and Auditory Images", ROY D. PATTERSON; JOHN HOLDS-WORTH, Advances in Speech, Hearing and Language Processing, JAI PRESS, (1991), vol. 3 |