EP2341617 - Acoustic resonator including an electret, and method for manufacturing said resonator, application to coupled-resonator switchable filters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [2011/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Defay, Emmanuel 14, place Saint Nizier 38340 Voreppe / FR | 02 /
Boisseau, Sébastien 41, boulevard Joseph Vallier 38100 Grenoble / FR | 03 /
Despesse, Ghislain 6, place Saint Christophe 38120 Saint-Egreve / FR | 04 /
Ivira, Brice 24, rue Henri Barbusse 18150 La Guerche sur l'Aubois / FR | 05 /
Reinhardt, Alexandre 12, rue des Fleurs 38000 Grenoble / FR | [2018/47] |
Former [2011/27] | 01 /
Defay, Emmanuel 14, place Saint Nizier 38340 Voreppe / FR | ||
02 /
Boisseau, Sébastien 41, boulevard Joseph Vallier 38100 Grenoble / FR | |||
03 /
Despesse, Ghislain 6, place Saint Christophe 38120 Saint-Egreve / FR | |||
04 /
Ivira, Brice 24, rue Henri Barbusse 18150 La Guerche sur l'Aubois / FR | |||
05 /
Reinhardt, Alexandre 12, rue des Fleurs 38000 Grenoble / FR | Representative(s) | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al BREVALEX 95, Rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/47] | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al BREVALEX 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | ||
Former [2011/27] | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al BREVALEX 95 rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | Application number, filing date | 10195864.3 | 20.12.2010 | [2011/27] | Priority number, date | FR20090059510 | 23.12.2009 Original published format: FR 0959510 | [2011/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2341617 | Date: | 06.07.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2341617 | Date: | 21.11.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H03H3/04, H03H9/02, H03H9/58, H03H9/17 | [2011/27] | CPC: |
H03H9/02015 (EP,US);
H03H3/04 (EP,US);
H03H9/02031 (EP,US);
H03H9/173 (EP,US);
H03H9/175 (EP,US);
H03H9/583 (EP,US);
H03H9/584 (EP,US);
H03H9/585 (EP,US);
H03H2003/0414 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/47] |
Former [2011/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Akustischer Resonator, der ein Elektret umfasst, sowie Herstellungsverfahren dieses Resonators und Anwendung auf gekoppelte Resonatoren bei umschaltbaren Filtern | [2011/27] | English: | Acoustic resonator including an electret, and method for manufacturing said resonator, application to coupled-resonator switchable filters | [2011/27] | French: | Résonateur acoustique comprenant un électret, et procédé de fabrication de ce résonateur, application aux filtres commutables à résonateurs couplés | [2011/27] | Examination procedure | 20.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/04] | 04.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.12.2010 | AL | 21.11.2018 | AT | 21.11.2018 | CY | 21.11.2018 | CZ | 21.11.2018 | DK | 21.11.2018 | EE | 21.11.2018 | ES | 21.11.2018 | FI | 21.11.2018 | HR | 21.11.2018 | IT | 21.11.2018 | LT | 21.11.2018 | LV | 21.11.2018 | MC | 21.11.2018 | MK | 21.11.2018 | MT | 21.11.2018 | NL | 21.11.2018 | PL | 21.11.2018 | RO | 21.11.2018 | RS | 21.11.2018 | SE | 21.11.2018 | SI | 21.11.2018 | SK | 21.11.2018 | SM | 21.11.2018 | TR | 21.11.2018 | IE | 20.12.2018 | LU | 20.12.2018 | BE | 31.12.2018 | CH | 31.12.2018 | LI | 31.12.2018 | BG | 21.02.2019 | NO | 21.02.2019 | GR | 22.02.2019 | IS | 21.03.2019 | PT | 21.03.2019 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 20.12.2010 | |
AL | 21.11.2018 | ||
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
MT | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
TR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IE | 20.12.2018 | ||
LU | 20.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
MT | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
TR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IE | 20.12.2018 | ||
LU | 20.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
MT | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
IE | 20.12.2018 | ||
LU | 20.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
IE | 20.12.2018 | ||
LU | 20.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SI | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
IE | 20.12.2018 | ||
LU | 20.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
IE | 20.12.2018 | ||
LU | 20.12.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
MC | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
LU | 20.12.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SK | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
LU | 20.12.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
EE | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RO | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
SM | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
PL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
DK | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
IT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 21.11.2018 | |
AT | 21.11.2018 | ||
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
PT | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
RS | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
SE | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
GR | 22.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 21.11.2018 | |
ES | 21.11.2018 | ||
FI | 21.11.2018 | ||
HR | 21.11.2018 | ||
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
LV | 21.11.2018 | ||
NL | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 21.11.2018 | |
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
BG | 21.02.2019 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 21.11.2018 | |
LT | 21.11.2018 | ||
NO | 21.02.2019 | ||
IS | 21.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 21.11.2018 | |
NO | 21.02.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2007063793 (JANG SEI-JOO [KR], et al) [X] 1-3,5-8,11,13,16,18-21 * paragraphs [0013] , [0023] , [0024]; figure 9; claims 22-25 * [I] 4,9,10,12,14,15,17; | [X]US2486560 (GRAY ROBERT B) [X] 1-3,6,16 * column 1, lines 1-19; figures 1,4 * * column 3, lines 2-10 *; | [A]US4057660 (YOSHIDA MASAFUMI, et al) [A] 1-21 * column 2, lines 45-49 *; | [A]US3118022 (SESSLER GERHARD M, et al) [A] 1-21 * column 1, line 70 - column 2, line 14 *; | [A]DE1245441 (TELEFUNKEN PATENT) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A] - WEI PANG ET AL, "Electrical Frequency Tuning of Film Bulk Acoustic Resonator", JOURNAL OF MICROELECTROMECHANICAL SYSTEMS, IEEE, (20071201), vol. 16, no. 6, pages 1303 - 1313, XP011197843 [A] 1-21 * section II; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JMEMS.2006.885846 | Examination | - LEONOV ET AL, "Stabilization of positive charge in SiO2/Si3N4 electrets", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON DIELECTRICS AND ELECTRICAL INSULATION, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20061001), vol. 13, no. 5, ISSN 1070-9878, pages 1049 - 1056, XP011142340 | - GUNTHER ET AL, "SiO2 electrets for electric-field generation in sensors and actuators", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS A, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA S.A., LAUSANNE, CH, vol. 32, no. 1-3, doi:10.1016/0924-4247(92)80012-R, ISSN 0924-4247, (19920401), pages 357 - 360, (19920401), XP026577000 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0924-4247(92)80012-R | by applicant | EP0608162 | US6928178 | FR2905207 | US2008129416 | US6720844 | US2005206476 | US6917261 | WO2005046052 | - J.A. GIACOMETTI ET AL., CORONA CHARGING OF POLYMERS, IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ELECTRICAL INSULATION, (199210), vol. 27, no. 5 | - FABIO PEANO ET AL., "Design and optimisation of a MEMS electret-based capacitive energy scavenger", J. OF ELECTROMECHANICAL SYSTEMS, (2005), vol. 14, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1109/JMEMS.2005.844803, XP002523269 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JMEMS.2005.844803 | - P. GUNTHER; CHARGING, "Long-term Stability, and TSD measurements of Si02 electrets", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ELECTRICAL INSULATION, (198906), vol. 24, no. 3 | - DE V. LEONOV ET AL., "Stabilization of Positive Charge in Si02/Si3N4 Electrets", IMEC, IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON DIELECTRICS AND ELECTRICAL INSULATION, (200610), vol. 13, no. 5, XP011142340 | - A. VOLATIER ET AL., DESIGN, ELABORATION AND CHARACTERIZATION OF COUPLED RESONATOR FILTERS FOR WCDMA APPLICATIONS, ULTRASONIC SYMPOSIUM, VANCOUVER BC, (2006), pages 829 - 832 | - BRAGG MIRROR, APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, (2008), vol. 92, no. 3, pages 032906 - 032909 | - DE K. IKEZAKI ET AL., "Thermally Stimulated Currents from Ion-Injected Teflon-FEP Film Electrets", JPN. J. APPL. PHYS., (1981), vol. 20, pages 1741 - 1747 | - M. BRUEL, "Silicon on insulator material technology", ELECTRONIC LETTERS, (1995), vol. 31, no. 14, doi:doi:10.1049/el:19950805, pages 1201 - 1202, XP006003062 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/el:19950805 | - L. DICIOCCIO ET AL., "Silicon carbide on insulator formation by Smart CutTM process", MASTER, SCI. ENG., (1997), vol. B46, pages 349 - 356 | - E. JALAGUIER ET AL., "Transfer on thin GaAs film on silicon substrate by proton implantation process", ELECTRONIC LETTERS, (1998), vol. 34, no. 4, pages 408 - 409 | - A. TAUZIN ET AL., "Transfers of 2- inch GaN films onto sapphire substrates using Smart CutTM technology", ELECTRONICS LETTERS, (2005), vol. 41, no. 11 | - W.E. NEWELL, "Face-mounted piezoelectric resonators", PROC. OF IEEE, (1965), pages 575 - 581, XP008076339 | - K.M. LAKIN ET AL., "Development of miniature filters for wireless applications", IEEE TRANS. MICROWAVE THEORY. TECH., (1995), vol. 43, no. 12, doi:doi:10.1109/22.475658, pages 2933 - 2939, XP000549444 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/22.475658 | - K.M. LAKIN, "Fundamental properties of thin film resonators", IEEE FREQ. CONTR. SYMP., (1991), doi:doi:10.1109/FREQ.1991.145902, pages 201 - 206, XP010040226 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/FREQ.1991.145902 | - A. SHIRAKAWA ET AL., "A high isolation and high selectivity Ladder-Lattice BAW BAW-SMR filter", IEEE EUR. MICROWAVE CONF., (2006), pages 905 - 908, XP031005717 | - K.M. LAKIN, "Coupled Resonator Filter", IEEE ULTRASON. SYMP., (2002), pages 901 - 908 | - G.G. FATTINGER ET AL., "Coupled bulk acoustic wave resonator filters : Key technology for single-to- balanced RF filters", IEEE MTT-S DIGEST, (2004), doi:doi:10.1109/MWSYM.2004.1339126, pages 927 - 929, XP010728278 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MWSYM.2004.1339126 |