EP2339509 - Information processing apparatus and information processing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.12.2016 [2016/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/26] | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hashiguchi, Noriyasu c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2011/26] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2011/26] | Application number, filing date | 10196123.3 | 21.12.2010 | [2011/26] | Priority number, date | JP20090292941 | 24.12.2009 Original published format: JP 2009292941 | [2011/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2339509 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2339509 | Date: | 27.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/46 | [2011/26] | CPC: |
G06V10/446 (EP,US);
G06F18/2148 (US);
G06V10/50 (EP,US);
G06V10/507 (EP,US);
G06V10/7747 (EP,US);
G06V40/161 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Informationsverarbeitungsvorrichtung und Informationsverarbeitungsverfahren | [2011/26] | English: | Information processing apparatus and information processing method | [2011/26] | French: | Appareil et procédé de traitement d'informations | [2011/26] | Examination procedure | 18.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/17] | 26.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/49] | 02.11.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.12.2016 | 01.12.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.10.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2008146934 (CANON KK [JP], et al) [A] 5,6 * page 58, paragraph 153 ** page 43, paragraph 117 *; | [XI] - WEI-SU WONG ET AL, A 100MHz hardware-efficient boost cascaded face detection design, IMAGE PROCESSING (ICIP), 2009 16TH IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, PAGE(S) 3237 - 3240, (20091107), ISBN 978-1-4244-5653-6, XP031629013 [X] 1,3-9 * sections 1, 2, 3.1, 3.2 * [I] 2 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICIP.2009.5414349 | [I] - H.J.W Belt, "Storage Size Reduction for the Integral Image", (20071231), URL: http://resolver.tudelft.nl/uuid:03ad5f72-dbcc-48fd-9e64-7d21c98894c7, XP055084595 [I] 1-9 * sections 2.2, 3.3.4, 3.3.5, 4.1, 4.2 * | Examination | - John C. Russ, "The Image Processing Handbook, Fourth Edition", The Image Processing Handbook, Boca Raton, FL, US, CRC Press, (20020101), pages 196 - 202, 031149, ISBN 978-0-8493-1142-0, XP055276437 | by applicant | - P. VIOLA; M. JONES, "Rapid Object Detection using a Boosted Cascade of Simple Features", PROC. IEEE CONF. ON COMPUTER VISION AND PATTERN RECOGNITION, (200112), vol. 1, pages 511 - 518, XP010583787 |