EP2339298 - Navigation device, movement history recording method, and non-transitory computer program storage device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.05.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 27.06.2018 [2018/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/26] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Terai, Takao c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku TOKYO Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
Nezu, Yoshiyuki c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku TOKYO Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2011/26] | Representative(s) | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/26] | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10196129.0 | 21.12.2010 | [2011/26] | Priority number, date | JP20090298944 | 28.12.2009 Original published format: JP 2009298944 | [2011/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2339298 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2339298 | Date: | 26.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/36, G01C21/34 | [2012/51] | CPC: |
G01C21/367 (EP,US);
G01C21/20 (EP,US);
G01C21/3423 (EP,US);
G01C22/00 (EP,US);
G01C22/002 (EP,US);
G01C22/006 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/26] | G01C21/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Navigationsvorrichtung, Aufzeichnungsverfahren des Bewegungsverlaufs und übergangslose Computerprogrammspeichervorrichtung | [2011/26] | English: | Navigation device, movement history recording method, and non-transitory computer program storage device | [2011/26] | French: | Dispositif de navigation, procédé d'enregistrement de l'historique de mouvements et dispositif de stockage non transitoire de programme informatique | [2011/26] | Examination procedure | 21.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/26] | 13.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/26] | 13.02.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 24.02.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.08.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1450133 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0009] - [0012] *; | [Y]EP1677077 (GIOVE SRL [IT]) [Y] 5,14 * paragraphs [0011] , [0013] , [0023] - [0025] - [0030] , [0038] , [0039] , [0045] , [0057] *; | [A]EP2051490 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0009] , [0010] , [0070] , [0366] , [0367] , [0486] - [0490] - [0496] - [0498] - [0505] , [0506] , [0516] - [0517] * * paragraphs [0525] - [0526] * * claims 1-7 *; | [XYI] - Google, "My Tracks", (20090211), URL: http://www.youtube.com/watch?v=IBmjJrgUGdE, (20121109), XP002686870 [X] 1-4,7-13,15 * Video time: 11s, 13s, 15s, 19s, 1m 21s, 2m 22s, * [Y] 5,14 [I] 6 | Examination | US2001027375 | JP2008283256 | - YU ZHENG ET AL, "Learning transportation mode from raw gps data for geographic applications on the web", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 17TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON WORLD WIDE WEB, WWW 2008, BEIJING, CHINA, APRIL 21-25, 2008, ACM, RED HOOK, NY, (20080421), doi:10.1145/1367497.1367532, ISBN 978-1-60558-085-2, pages 247 - 256, XP058289328 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1367497.1367532 | by applicant | JP2009298944 |