EP2468597 - Adaptation of a force-to-torque-characteristic for a launch clutch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.03.2015 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.04.2015 [2015/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National Electric Vehicle Sweden AB Saabvägen 5 461 38 Trollhättan / SE | [2014/06] |
Former [2012/26] | For all designated states Saab Automobile AB 461 80 Trollhättan / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Freudenthaler, Pär / Soberg 110 442 92, Romelanda / SE | 02 /
Berndtson, Tobias / s Håkansgården1 467 91, Grästorp / SE | [2012/26] | Representative(s) | Edlund, Fabian Awapatent AB P.O. Box 11 394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | [2013/07] |
Former [2012/26] | Haag, Malina Anna, et al Awapatent AB Södra Hamngatan 37-41 Box 11394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 10196260.3 | 21.12.2010 | [2012/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2468597 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B60W10/02, B60W10/06, B60W10/08, B60W20/00, B60W30/18, F16D48/06 | [2012/26] | CPC: |
B60W10/02 (EP,US);
B60W20/40 (US);
B60W10/06 (EP);
B60W10/08 (EP);
B60W20/00 (EP);
B60W30/186 (EP);
F16D48/06 (EP);
B60K2006/4816 (EP);
B60W2050/0075 (EP);
B60Y2300/49 (EP);
F16D2500/1066 (EP);
F16D2500/70211 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Anpassung einer Kraft-Drehmoment-Kennlinie für eine Anfahrkupplung | [2012/26] | English: | Adaptation of a force-to-torque-characteristic for a launch clutch | [2012/26] | French: | Adaptation d'une caractéristique force-couple pour un embrayage de lancement | [2012/26] | Examination procedure | 19.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/07] | 13.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/18] | 22.12.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/18] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.05.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 19.12.2011 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2013/44] | 02.01.2014 | Resumption of proceedings | [2013/44] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9932315 (RENAULT [FR]) [A] 1-14 * sentences 8-17 * * page 9, line 9 - page 10, line 15 * * figure 3 *; | [A]US2004159183 (SAKAMOTO HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-14* paragraphs [0031] - [0037] *; | [XI]EP2014946 (LUK LAMELLEN & KUPPLUNGSBAU [DE]) [X] 1-4,11-14 * paragraphs [0006] - [0008] * [I] 5-10; | [X]DE102007050987 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,3 * paragraph [0004]; claim 1 *; | [X]EP2107264 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [X] 1-4,11-14 * paragraph [0016] *; | [XI]US2009255743 (DILZER MARTIN [DE], et al) [X] 1,3,4,11-14 * paragraphs [0010] - [0016] - [0034] * [I] 2,5-10; | [X]US2010004837 (CONNOLLY TOM [US], et al) [X] 1,3 * claim 1 * |