EP2469292 - Location estimation by observing wireless signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.12.2017 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.01.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states u-blox AG Zürcherstrasse 68 8800 Thalwil / CH | [2012/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yule, Andrew c/o u-blox UK Ltd Foundation House 42-48 London Road Reigate, Surrey RH2 9QQ / GB | 02 /
Marshall, Chris c/o u-blox UK Ltd Foundation House 42-48 London Road Reigate, Surrey RH2 9QQ / GB | [2012/26] | Representative(s) | O'Callaghan, Robert James, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [2012/52] |
Former [2012/26] | Ertl, Nicholas Justin Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 10196316.3 | 21.12.2010 | [2012/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2469292 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2469292 | Date: | 08.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01S5/02 | [2012/26] | CPC: |
G01S5/0263 (EP,US);
G01S5/02521 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/06] |
Former [2012/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Standortschätzung durch Beobachtung drahtloser Signale | [2012/26] | English: | Location estimation by observing wireless signals | [2012/26] | French: | Évaluation d'emplacement par l'observation de signaux sans fil | [2012/26] | Examination procedure | 19.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/07] | 22.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | 09.11.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.12.2010 | AL | 08.02.2017 | AT | 08.02.2017 | CH | 08.02.2017 | CY | 08.02.2017 | CZ | 08.02.2017 | DK | 08.02.2017 | EE | 08.02.2017 | ES | 08.02.2017 | FI | 08.02.2017 | HR | 08.02.2017 | IT | 08.02.2017 | LI | 08.02.2017 | LT | 08.02.2017 | LV | 08.02.2017 | MC | 08.02.2017 | MK | 08.02.2017 | NL | 08.02.2017 | PL | 08.02.2017 | RO | 08.02.2017 | RS | 08.02.2017 | SE | 08.02.2017 | SI | 08.02.2017 | SK | 08.02.2017 | SM | 08.02.2017 | TR | 08.02.2017 | BG | 08.05.2017 | NO | 08.05.2017 | GR | 09.05.2017 | IS | 08.06.2017 | PT | 08.06.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 21.12.2010 | |
AT | 08.02.2017 | ||
CH | 08.02.2017 | ||
CY | 08.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LI | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
MC | 08.02.2017 | ||
MK | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
TR | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 21.12.2010 | |
AT | 08.02.2017 | ||
CH | 08.02.2017 | ||
CY | 08.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LI | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
MC | 08.02.2017 | ||
MK | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 21.12.2010 | |
AT | 08.02.2017 | ||
CH | 08.02.2017 | ||
CY | 08.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LI | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
MC | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 21.12.2010 | |
AT | 08.02.2017 | ||
CH | 08.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LI | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
MC | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CH | 08.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LI | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
MC | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CH | 08.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LI | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
PL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007081496 (KARGE RALF [DE], et al) [A] 1,12,14 * abstract ** paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0019] *; | [A]WO2007056738 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [A] 1,12,14 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0039] *; | [XD]WO2009141660 (GEOTATE BV [NL], et al) [XD] 1,12,14 * abstract * * page 6, line 28 - page 15, line 8 *; | [A]WO2010141934 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [A] 1,12,14 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0055] * | by applicant | WO2009141660 | WO2009141642 | WO2010015854 |