EP2338937 - Composition for thermosetting silicone resin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.12.2014 [2014/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka / JP | [2011/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamamoto, Mizuki c/o Nitto Denko Corporation 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka / JP | [2011/26] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/26] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10196365.0 | 22.12.2010 | [2011/26] | Priority number, date | JP20090292766 | 24.12.2009 Original published format: JP 2009292766 | [2011/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2338937 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C08L83/04, H01L23/29 | [2011/26] | CPC: |
H01L23/296 (EP,KR,US);
C08L83/04 (EP,KR,US);
C08G77/08 (KR);
C08G77/12 (EP,KR,US);
C08G77/16 (EP,KR,US);
C08K5/5425 (EP,KR,US);
C08K5/56 (EP,US);
C08K5/57 (EP,US);
C08L2201/02 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C08L83/04, C08L83/00 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Wärmehärtende Silikonharzzusammensetzung | [2011/26] | English: | Composition for thermosetting silicone resin | [2011/26] | French: | Composition de résine de silicone thermodurcissable | [2011/26] | Examination procedure | 30.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/46] | 13.11.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5270425 (VANWERT BERNARD [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * columns 5-7; claims 1-2 *; | [X]US2008003370 (SWEET RANDALL P [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0009] - [0017]; claims 1-7; tables 2-6 *; | [IP]EP2196503 (NITTO DENKO CORP [JP]) [IP] 1-6* the whole document * | by applicant | JPH06118254 | JP2000198930 | JP2004186168 | JP2008150437 | JP2009292766 |