EP2468445 - Laser processing machine with a diode laser, which laser beam can rotate around its axis, and method of machining a workpiece [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.06.2017 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bystronic Laser AG Industriestrasse 21 3362 Niederönz / CH | [2012/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lüdi, Andreas Alpenstrasse 28 3400 Burgdorf / CH | 02 /
Wittwer, Stefan Lanzenbühlweg 2a 3360 Herzogenbuchsee / CH | [2012/26] | Representative(s) | PPR AG BGZ 9497 Triesenberg / LI | [N/P] |
Former [2012/26] | Patentbüro Paul Rosenich AG BGZ 9497 Triesenberg / LI | Application number, filing date | 10196641.4 | 22.12.2010 | [2012/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2468445 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2468445 | Date: | 24.08.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B23K26/073, B23K26/20, B23K26/38, B23K26/08 | [2012/26] | CPC: |
B23K26/0734 (EP);
B23K26/0876 (EP);
B23K26/24 (EP);
B23K26/38 (EP);
B23K2101/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/34] |
Former [2012/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Laserbearbeitungsmaschine mit einem Diodenlaser, dessen Strahl um seine Strahlachse drehbar ist, und Verfahren zur Bearbeitung eines Werkstücks | [2012/26] | English: | Laser processing machine with a diode laser, which laser beam can rotate around its axis, and method of machining a workpiece | [2012/26] | French: | Machine de traitement au laser avec un laser diode, dont son faisceau peut tourner autour de son axe, et procédé de traitement d'une pièce | [2016/17] |
Former [2012/26] | Machine de traitement au laser avec un laser diode, dont le faisceau peut tourner autour de son axe, et procédé de traitement d'une pièce | Examination procedure | 08.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/08] | 02.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.12.2010 | AL | 24.08.2016 | CY | 24.08.2016 | CZ | 24.08.2016 | DK | 24.08.2016 | EE | 24.08.2016 | ES | 24.08.2016 | FI | 24.08.2016 | HR | 24.08.2016 | IS | 24.08.2016 | IT | 24.08.2016 | LT | 24.08.2016 | LV | 24.08.2016 | MC | 24.08.2016 | MK | 24.08.2016 | MT | 24.08.2016 | NL | 24.08.2016 | PL | 24.08.2016 | RO | 24.08.2016 | RS | 24.08.2016 | SE | 24.08.2016 | SI | 24.08.2016 | SK | 24.08.2016 | SM | 24.08.2016 | TR | 24.08.2016 | BG | 24.11.2016 | NO | 24.11.2016 | GR | 25.11.2016 | AT | 22.12.2016 | GB | 22.12.2016 | IE | 22.12.2016 | LU | 22.12.2016 | PT | 26.12.2016 | BE | 31.12.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/43] | HU | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IS | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
MK | 24.08.2016 | ||
MT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
TR | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
AT | 22.12.2016 | ||
GB | 22.12.2016 | ||
IE | 22.12.2016 | ||
LU | 22.12.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IS | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
MK | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
TR | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
AT | 22.12.2016 | ||
GB | 22.12.2016 | ||
IE | 22.12.2016 | ||
LU | 22.12.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
MK | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
TR | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
AT | 22.12.2016 | ||
GB | 22.12.2016 | ||
IE | 22.12.2016 | ||
LU | 22.12.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
MK | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
AT | 22.12.2016 | ||
GB | 22.12.2016 | ||
IE | 22.12.2016 | ||
LU | 22.12.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/24] | CZ | 24.08.2016 | |
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
AT | 22.12.2016 | ||
GB | 22.12.2016 | ||
IE | 22.12.2016 | ||
LU | 22.12.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 24.08.2016 | |
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
GB | 22.12.2016 | ||
IE | 22.12.2016 | ||
LU | 22.12.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 24.08.2016 | |
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
IE | 22.12.2016 | ||
LU | 22.12.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/45] | CZ | 24.08.2016 | |
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 24.08.2016 | |
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | CZ | 24.08.2016 | |
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | ES | 24.08.2016 | |
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | ES | 24.08.2016 | |
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 24.08.2016 | |
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 24.08.2016 | |
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
NO | 24.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 24.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2006113289 (EHRMANN JONATHAN S [US], et al) [I] 1-3,5,7,10,11,13-15 * paragraphs [0007] , [0018] , [0104] , [0116] , [0129] , [0134] , [0141] , [0148] - [0149]; figures 12a-b,13a-c,14-15 *; | [A]US6044096 (WOLAK EDMUND L [US], et al) [A] 1-3,5,7,10,11,13-15 * column 1, lines 22-29 * * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 8; figure - *; | [X]US6331692 (KRAUSE VOLKER [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7-9,13-15 * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 20 * * column 4, lines 13-34 * * column 7, lines 4-33; figure - *; | [A]US5120926 (MARRIOTT DAVID A [US]) [A] 2,3,13-15 * abstract * | Examination | US2010122972 | by applicant | DE19839482 | DE19859243 | DE102008053397 | JPH06320296 | US2009045176 |