EP2374519 - Liquid filter and operating method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/41] | Liquid filter and operation method | ||
[2013/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.12.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAHLE International GmbH Pragstrasse 26-46 70376 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/41] | For all designated states MAHLE International GmbH Pragstrasse 26-46 70376 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gröner, Alfred In den Hofäckern 20 74613, Öhringen / DE | 02 /
Steiner, Gerhard Röntgenstrasse 10 74613 Öhringen / DE | [2011/41] | Representative(s) | BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater Königstraße 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/08] | BRP Renaud & Partner Rechtsanwälte Notare Patentanwälte Königstraße 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2011/41] | BRP Renaud & Partner Rechtsanwälte Notare Patentanwälte Königstrasse 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 10196696.8 | 23.12.2010 | [2011/41] | Priority number, date | DE20101005817 | 27.01.2010 Original published format: DE102010005817 | [2011/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2374519 | Date: | 12.10.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2374519 | Date: | 19.02.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B01D35/147, B01D36/00 | [2011/41] | CPC: |
B01D35/147 (EP);
B01D35/30 (EP);
B01D36/001 (EP);
B01D2201/208 (EP);
B01D2201/301 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/41] | Title | German: | Flüssigkeitsfilter und Betriebsverfahren | [2011/41] | English: | Liquid filter and operating method | [2013/30] | French: | Filtre pour liquides et méthode d'utilisation | [2013/30] |
Former [2011/41] | Liquid filter and operation method | ||
Former [2011/41] | Filtre pour liquides et mode d'emploi | Examination procedure | 31.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/21] | 25.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 20.11.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.12.2010 | AL | 19.02.2014 | BG | 19.02.2014 | CY | 19.02.2014 | CZ | 19.02.2014 | DK | 19.02.2014 | EE | 19.02.2014 | ES | 19.02.2014 | FI | 19.02.2014 | HR | 19.02.2014 | IT | 19.02.2014 | LT | 19.02.2014 | LV | 19.02.2014 | MC | 19.02.2014 | MK | 19.02.2014 | MT | 19.02.2014 | NL | 19.02.2014 | PL | 19.02.2014 | RO | 19.02.2014 | SE | 19.02.2014 | SI | 19.02.2014 | SK | 19.02.2014 | SM | 19.02.2014 | TR | 19.02.2014 | NO | 19.05.2014 | GR | 20.05.2014 | IS | 19.06.2014 | PT | 19.06.2014 | RS | 03.09.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 23.12.2010 | |
BG | 19.02.2014 | ||
CY | 19.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2014 | ||
DK | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
HR | 19.02.2014 | ||
IT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
MC | 19.02.2014 | ||
MK | 19.02.2014 | ||
MT | 19.02.2014 | ||
NL | 19.02.2014 | ||
PL | 19.02.2014 | ||
RO | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
SI | 19.02.2014 | ||
SK | 19.02.2014 | ||
SM | 19.02.2014 | ||
TR | 19.02.2014 | ||
NO | 19.05.2014 | ||
GR | 20.05.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 23.12.2010 | |
BG | 19.02.2014 | ||
CY | 19.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2014 | ||
DK | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
HR | 19.02.2014 | ||
IT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
MC | 19.02.2014 | ||
MT | 19.02.2014 | ||
NL | 19.02.2014 | ||
PL | 19.02.2014 | ||
RO | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
SI | 19.02.2014 | ||
SK | 19.02.2014 | ||
SM | 19.02.2014 | ||
TR | 19.02.2014 | ||
NO | 19.05.2014 | ||
GR | 20.05.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 23.12.2010 | |
BG | 19.02.2014 | ||
CY | 19.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2014 | ||
DK | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
HR | 19.02.2014 | ||
IT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
MC | 19.02.2014 | ||
NL | 19.02.2014 | ||
PL | 19.02.2014 | ||
RO | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
SI | 19.02.2014 | ||
SK | 19.02.2014 | ||
SM | 19.02.2014 | ||
TR | 19.02.2014 | ||
NO | 19.05.2014 | ||
GR | 20.05.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 19.02.2014 | |
CY | 19.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2014 | ||
DK | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
HR | 19.02.2014 | ||
IT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
MC | 19.02.2014 | ||
NL | 19.02.2014 | ||
PL | 19.02.2014 | ||
RO | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
SI | 19.02.2014 | ||
SK | 19.02.2014 | ||
SM | 19.02.2014 | ||
NO | 19.05.2014 | ||
GR | 20.05.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | CY | 19.02.2014 | |
CZ | 19.02.2014 | ||
DK | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
HR | 19.02.2014 | ||
IT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
MC | 19.02.2014 | ||
NL | 19.02.2014 | ||
PL | 19.02.2014 | ||
RO | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
SI | 19.02.2014 | ||
SK | 19.02.2014 | ||
SM | 19.02.2014 | ||
NO | 19.05.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 19.02.2014 | |
CZ | 19.02.2014 | ||
DK | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
HR | 19.02.2014 | ||
IT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
NL | 19.02.2014 | ||
PL | 19.02.2014 | ||
RO | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
SI | 19.02.2014 | ||
SK | 19.02.2014 | ||
SM | 19.02.2014 | ||
NO | 19.05.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 19.02.2014 | |
CZ | 19.02.2014 | ||
DK | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
HR | 19.02.2014 | ||
IT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
NL | 19.02.2014 | ||
PL | 19.02.2014 | ||
RO | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
SI | 19.02.2014 | ||
SK | 19.02.2014 | ||
NO | 19.05.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | CY | 19.02.2014 | |
CZ | 19.02.2014 | ||
DK | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
HR | 19.02.2014 | ||
IT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
NL | 19.02.2014 | ||
PL | 19.02.2014 | ||
RO | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
SK | 19.02.2014 | ||
NO | 19.05.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 19.02.2014 | |
CZ | 19.02.2014 | ||
DK | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
HR | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
NL | 19.02.2014 | ||
PL | 19.02.2014 | ||
RO | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
SK | 19.02.2014 | ||
NO | 19.05.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 19.02.2014 | |
CZ | 19.02.2014 | ||
DK | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
HR | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
NL | 19.02.2014 | ||
PL | 19.02.2014 | ||
RO | 19.02.2014 | ||
RS | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
SK | 19.02.2014 | ||
NO | 19.05.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 19.02.2014 | |
CZ | 19.02.2014 | ||
DK | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
HR | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
NL | 19.02.2014 | ||
RO | 19.02.2014 | ||
RS | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
NO | 19.05.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 19.02.2014 | |
CZ | 19.02.2014 | ||
DK | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
HR | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
NL | 19.02.2014 | ||
RS | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
NO | 19.05.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 19.02.2014 | |
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
HR | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
NL | 19.02.2014 | ||
RS | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
NO | 19.05.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | CY | 19.02.2014 | |
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
NL | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
NO | 19.05.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 19.02.2014 | |
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
NO | 19.05.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 19.02.2014 | |
NO | 19.05.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1935468 (MAHLE INT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,12 * paragraph [0017]; figure 2 *; | [A]US4865632 (YANO HISASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,12 * figure 1a * | by applicant | DE19716085 |