EP2311754 - Tilt-activated valve stem actuator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.05.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S.C. Johnson & Son, Inc. 1525 Howe Street Racine, WI 53403 / US | [2011/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Helf, Thomas A. 12780 West weatherstone Court New Berlin, WI 53151 / US | 02 /
Paas, Edward L. 81 Chester Circle Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | [2011/16] | Representative(s) | Ruschke, Hans Edvard Ruschke Madgwick Seide & Kollegen Patentanwälte Patent Attorney (UK) PartG mbB Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/16] | Ruschke, Hans Edvard Ruschke Madgwick Seide & Kollegen Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10196957.4 | 13.08.2008 | [2011/16] | Priority number, date | US20070893456 | 16.08.2007 Original published format: US 893456 | [2011/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2311754 | Date: | 20.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2311754 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | [2011/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B65D83/14, B65D83/16 | [2011/16] | CPC: |
A61L9/14 (EP,US);
B65D83/262 (EP,US);
B65D83/46 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/16] | Title | German: | Betätigung für ein Kippventil | [2011/16] | English: | Tilt-activated valve stem actuator | [2011/16] | French: | Valve à basculement | [2011/16] | Examination procedure | 05.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/08] | 07.05.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/24] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08795266.9 / EP2188192 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080795266) is 22.07.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1033025 (HEUER TIMER CORP) [X] 1-4,8,9 * the whole document *; | [X]US3368717 (WEBER III ROBERT L) [X] 1-4,8,9 * the whole document * | by applicant | US4133408 | US5027982 | US5609605 | US4064782 | US20070801557 |