EP2372869 - Power control apparatus and power control method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.06.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.07.2015 [2015/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-Chome Minato-Ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [2011/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohno, Katsuya Toshiba Corporation Intellectual Property Division 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [2011/40] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/40] | Henkel, Breuer & Partner Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10197324.6 | 29.12.2010 | [2011/40] | Priority number, date | JP20100084353 | 31.03.2010 Original published format: JP 2010084353 | [2011/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2372869 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/40] | Classification | IPC: | H02J9/00 | [2011/40] | CPC: |
H02J9/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Leistungsregelungsvorrichtung und Leistungsregelungsverfahren | [2011/40] | English: | Power control apparatus and power control method | [2011/40] | French: | Appareil de contrôle de puissance et contrôle de puissance correspondant | [2011/40] | Examination procedure | 29.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/40] | 03.06.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | JP2010084353 | JP2004274897 | JP2009015649 |