EP2211191 - Multifunction word recognizer element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.11.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.12.2017 [2017/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tektronix, Inc. 14150 SW Karl Braun Drive P.O. Box 500, M/S 50-LAW Beaverton, Oregon 97077-0001 / US | [2014/39] |
Former [2010/30] | For all designated states Tektronix, Inc. 14150 SW Karl Braun Drive P.O. Box 500 Beaverton, OR 97077-0001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stoops, John F. 9140 SW Camille Terrace Portland, OR 97223 / US | 02 /
Knierim, Daniel G. 14170 SW Barlow Road Beaverton, OR 97008 / US | [2010/30] | Representative(s) | HGF Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/03] | Clarke, Jeffrey, et al Harrison Goddard Foote LLP Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield, Yorkshire S1 2JA / GB | ||
Former [2010/30] | Brinck, David John Borchardt, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10250061.8 | 14.01.2010 | [2010/30] | Priority number, date | US20090355038 | 16.01.2009 Original published format: US 355038 | [2010/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2211191 | Date: | 28.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2211191 | Date: | 20.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/3177, G01R13/02, H03K5/24 | [2017/08] | CPC: |
H03K5/2481 (EP,US);
G01R31/3177 (EP,US);
G01R13/0254 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/30] | G01R31/3177 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Multifunktionelles Worterkennungselement | [2010/30] | English: | Multifunction word recognizer element | [2010/30] | French: | Élément multifunction de reconnaissance de mots | [2010/30] | Examination procedure | 20.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/07] | 16.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/51] | 02.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/51] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.02.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2017 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0367345 (PHILIPS ELECTRONIQUE LAB [FR], et al) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]FR2457495 (TEKTRONIX INC [US]) [X] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [X]US6633838 (ARIMILLI LAKSHMINARAYANA BABA [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]US2003126502 (LITT TIMOTHE [US]) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]EP0241616 (TEKTRONIX INC [US]) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]US2006083268 (HOLADAY DAVID A [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * |