EP2229896 - Access port including centering feature [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.05.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2015 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | 08.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2012/52] |
Former [2010/38] | For all designated states Tyco Healthcare Group LP 60 Middletown Avenue North Haven, CT 06473 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Abrams, Michael E. 22 River Terrace, Apt. 5H New York, NY 10282 / US | [2010/38] | Representative(s) | Soames, Candida Jane, et al Maschio & Soames IP Limited 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/45] | Soames, Candida Jane, et al Edwards Wildman Innovations LLP 10 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EZ / GB | ||
Former [2010/38] | Soames, Candida Jane Edwards Angell Palmer & Dodge Innovations LLP 10 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10250488.3 | 16.03.2010 | [2010/38] | Priority number, date | US20090160733P | 17.03.2009 Original published format: US 160733 P | US20100717268 | 04.03.2010 Original published format: US 717268 | [2010/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2229896 | Date: | 22.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/34 | [2010/38] | CPC: |
A61B17/3462 (EP,US);
A61B2017/3464 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Zugangsanschluss mit Zentrierungsfunktion | [2010/38] | English: | Access port including centering feature | [2010/38] | French: | Port d'accès incluant une fonction de centrage | [2010/38] | Examination procedure | 22.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/17] | 26.11.2014 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 08.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/24] | 03.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2015 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0538060 (ETHICON INC [US]) [X] 1-14 * column 9, line 23 - column 12, line 11; figures 11-16 *; | [X]EP1637178 (STORZ KARL GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [X]US5662615 (BLAKE III JOSEPH W [US]) [X] 1,2,4,6-12 * column 4 - column 5; figures 1-4 *; | [X]US2008294125 (FOCHT KENNETH ALLEN [US], et al) [X] 9-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US2008097332 (GREENHALGH ELLIS S [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0538060 | EP1637178 | US5662615 |