EP2251248 - A controller and control method for a motorised vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.2015 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Penny & Giles Controls Limited 15 Airfield Road Christchurch Dorset BH23 3TG / GB | [2013/07] |
Former [2010/46] | For all designated states PG Drives Technology Ltd 1-4 Airspeed Road Christchurch, Dorset BH23 4HD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sharp, Nigel Peter 120 Seafield Road Bournemouth Dorset BH6 3JL / GB | 02 /
Garnett, Glenn Leigh 2 Lilley Close Marchwood Southhampton Hampshire SO40 4SW / GB | [2014/43] |
Former [2010/46] | 01 /
Sharp, Nigel Peter 120 Seafield Road Bournemouth Dorset BH6 3JL / GB | ||
02 /
Garnett, Glenn Leigh 2 Lilley Close Marchwood Southhampton Hampshire SO40 4SW / GB | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/43] | Horner, David Richard D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2010/46] | Horner, David Richard D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 10250508.8 | 18.03.2010 | [2010/46] | Priority number, date | GB20090006863 | 21.04.2009 Original published format: GB 0906863 | [2010/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2251248 | Date: | 17.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2251248 | Date: | 22.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B62D11/04 | [2010/46] | CPC: |
B62D11/003 (EP,US);
B60L15/2036 (EP,GB,US);
A61G5/041 (EP,US);
B60L15/2009 (EP,US);
B60L15/2045 (GB);
B60L15/32 (GB);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/46] | Title | German: | Steuerung und Steuerungsverfahren für motorisiertes Fahrzeug | [2010/46] | English: | A controller and control method for a motorised vehicle | [2010/46] | French: | Contrôleur et procédé de contrôle pour véhicule à moteur | [2010/46] | Examination procedure | 12.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/25] | 22.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 22.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.04.2014 | Opposition(s) | 23.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.03.2010 | AT | 22.10.2014 | BG | 22.10.2014 | CY | 22.10.2014 | CZ | 22.10.2014 | EE | 22.10.2014 | ES | 22.10.2014 | HR | 22.10.2014 | IT | 22.10.2014 | LT | 22.10.2014 | LV | 22.10.2014 | MC | 22.10.2014 | MK | 22.10.2014 | MT | 22.10.2014 | PL | 22.10.2014 | RO | 22.10.2014 | SI | 22.10.2014 | SK | 22.10.2014 | SM | 22.10.2014 | TR | 22.10.2014 | GR | 23.01.2015 | IS | 22.02.2015 | PT | 23.02.2015 | IE | 18.03.2015 | LU | 18.03.2015 | CH | 31.03.2015 | LI | 31.03.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 18.03.2010 | |
AT | 22.10.2014 | ||
BG | 22.10.2014 | ||
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
IT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
MC | 22.10.2014 | ||
MT | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
SI | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
SM | 22.10.2014 | ||
TR | 22.10.2014 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
IE | 18.03.2015 | ||
LU | 18.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
IT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
MC | 22.10.2014 | ||
MT | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
SI | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
IE | 18.03.2015 | ||
LU | 18.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
IT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
MC | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
SI | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
IE | 18.03.2015 | ||
LU | 18.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
IT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
MC | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
IE | 18.03.2015 | ||
LU | 18.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
IT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
MC | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
LU | 18.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
IT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
MC | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
LU | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
IT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
MC | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
IT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
SK | 22.10.2014 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
RO | 22.10.2014 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
EE | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
CY | 22.10.2014 | ||
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 22.10.2014 | |
ES | 22.10.2014 | ||
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 22.10.2014 | |
HR | 22.10.2014 | ||
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
LV | 22.10.2014 | ||
PL | 22.10.2014 | ||
GR | 23.01.2015 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 22.10.2014 | |
LT | 22.10.2014 | ||
IS | 22.02.2015 | ||
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 22.10.2014 | |
PT | 23.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 22.10.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3826097 (ORTOPEDIA GMBH [DE]); | [A]US2007080656 (KOERLIN JAMES M [US]); | [A]WO2008065322 (P G DRIVES TECHNOLOGY LTD [GB], et al); |