EP2233181 - Game apparatus, game progressing method, and recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2015 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.2015 [2015/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Square Enix (also trading as Square Enix Co., Ltd.) 3-22-7, Yoyogi, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-8544 / JP | [2010/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kikuchi, Keiji C/o Square Enix Co., Ltd., 19-19, Chaya-machi, Kita-ku Osaka-city, Osaka 530-0013 / JP | [2010/39] | Representative(s) | Korenberg, Alexander Tal, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/15] | Korenberg, Alexander Tal, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2010/39] | Pitchford, James Edward, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10250544.3 | 23.03.2010 | [2010/39] | Priority number, date | JP20090072620 | 24.03.2009 Original published format: JP 2009072620 | [2010/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2233181 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2233181 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | [2011/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A63F13/00 | [2010/39] | CPC: |
A63F13/10 (EP);
A63F13/42 (US);
A63F13/44 (US);
A63F13/45 (EP);
A63F2300/6045 (EP,US);
A63F2300/638 (EP,US);
A63F2300/643 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Spielvorrichtung, Spielbearbeitungsverfahren und Aufzeichnungsmedium | [2010/39] | English: | Game apparatus, game progressing method, and recording medium | [2010/39] | French: | Appareil de jeu, procédé de progrès du jeu et support d'enregistrement | [2010/39] | Examination procedure | 08.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/42] | 04.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/47] | 09.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/47] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.02.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.05.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5974442 (ADAMS ROBERT THEODORE [US]) [A] 1,5-7 * abstract * * column 1, line 43 - line 58 * * column 7, line 5 - column 8, line 54 * * claims 1,4,7,8,13 *; | [A]EP1565035 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [A] 1,5-7 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0069] *; | [A]EP1844823 (NINTENDO CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,5-7 * paragraph [0108] - paragraph [0110] * * paragraph [0156] - paragraph [0160] * * paragraph [0170] ** paragraph [0173] - paragraph [0174] *; | [I]JP2009045273 (NAMCO BANDAI GAMES INC) [I] 1,5-7 * abstract *; | [I] - YAHN W BERNIER, "Latency Compensation Methods in Client/Server In-Game Protocol Design and Optimization", INTERNET CITATION, (20010320), URL: http://developer.valvesoftware.com/wiki/Latency_Compensating_Methods_in_Client/Server_In-game_Protocol_Design_and_Optimization, (20051006), XP002347952 [I] 1,5-7 * "interpolation" section. "Display of Targets" paragraph on the website.; page 9 * |