EP2234050 - Predictive coding of documents in an electronic discovery system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.03.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2014 | Refusal of application | published on 30.04.2014 [2014/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bank of America Corporation Mailcode: NC1-002-29-01 101 South Tryon Street Charlotte, NC 28255 / US | [2010/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Richards, Phillip L. Mailcode: NC-002-29-01 101 South Tryon Street Charlotte North Carolina 28255 / US | 02 /
Andersen, David M. Mailcode: NC-002-29-01 101 South Tryon Street Charlotte North Carolina 28255 / US | 03 /
Miller, Emerson D. Mailcode: NC-002-29-01 101 South Tryon Street Charlotte North Carolina 28255 / US | 04 /
Clark, Benjamin Mailcode: NC-002-29-01 101 South Tryon Street Charlotte North Carolina 28255 / US | 05 /
Knox, Jeffrey V. Mailcode: NC-002-29-01 101 South Tryon Street Charlotte North Carolina 28255 / US | 06 /
Mayer, Michael J. Mailcode: NC-002-29-01 101 South Tryon Street Charlotte North Carolina 28255 / US | [2010/39] | Representative(s) | Kinsler, Maureen Catherine, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/39] | Kinsler, Maureen Catherine, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | Application number, filing date | 10250583.1 | 26.03.2010 | [2010/39] | Priority number, date | US20090164276 | 27.03.2009 Original published format: US 164276 | US20100730780 | 24.03.2010 Original published format: US 730780 | [2010/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2234050 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2234050 | Date: | 24.11.2010 | [2010/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00 | [2010/39] | CPC: |
G06Q10/10 (EP,US);
G06Q10/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Prädiktive Codierung von Dokumenten in einem elektronischen Entdeckungssystem | [2010/39] | English: | Predictive coding of documents in an electronic discovery system | [2010/39] | French: | Codage prédictif de documents dans un système de découverte électronique | [2010/39] | Examination procedure | 19.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/26] | 26.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.12.2013 | 06.12.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 09.12.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2014/18] | 19.12.2013 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2014/18] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.04.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003182375 (ZHU MIN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003200308 (TAMEDA EIJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2006095795 (NAKAMURA OSAMU [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]US7076543 (KIRTI RITURAJ [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]US2007112783 (MCCREIGHT SHAWN [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]WO2007076515 (HAYES CHRISTIAN [US]) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]US2008027895 (COMBAZ JEAN-CHRISTOPHE [FR]) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2008061146 (KOMAKI YOSHIO [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]WO2008070415 (DEEPDIVE TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A] - DAN MANSON ET AL, "Is the Open Way a Better Way? Digital Forensics Using Open Source Tools", SYSTEM SCIENCES, 2007. HICSS 2007. 40TH ANNUAL HAWAII INTERNATIONAL CO NFERENCE ON, IEEE, PI, (20070101), ISBN 978-0-7695-2755-0, pages 266B - 266B, XP031013756 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - Anonymous, "EDRM LegalTech 2009 Luncheon Presentation", LegalTech New York, (20090209), E.D.R.M. -The Electronic Discovery Reference Model, URL: http://edrm.net/002/wp-content/uploads/2009/09/EDRM_LegalTech.pdf, (20100917), XP002601404 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - J. Barlow, L. Bean and D.D. Hott, "Employee "spy" software: should you use it ?", (20030405), URL: http://onlinelibrary.wiley.com/doi/10.1002/jcaf.10162/abstract, (20100917), XP002601405 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jcaf.10162 |