EP2238926 - Devices for providing access into a body cavity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.01.2019 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.04.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.02.2019 [2019/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ethicon LLC 475 Street C, Suite 401 Los Frailes Industrial Park 00969 Guaynabo / PR | [2018/31] |
Former [2010/41] | For all designated states Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shelton, Frederick E., IV 245 East Main Street Hillsboro, OH 45133 / US | 02 /
Shurtleff, Carl J. 4735 Medallion Way Mason, OH 45040 / US | [2010/41] | Representative(s) | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/41] | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 10250701.9 | 31.03.2010 | [2010/41] | Priority number, date | US20090165080P | 31.03.2009 Original published format: US 165080 P | US20090479418 | 05.06.2009 Original published format: US 479418 | [2010/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2238926 | Date: | 13.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2238926 | Date: | 22.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/34 | [2010/41] | CPC: |
A61B17/3423 (EP,US);
A61B17/34 (KR);
A61B17/02 (KR);
A61B17/0218 (KR);
A61B17/3462 (EP,KR,US);
A61M39/06 (KR);
A61B2017/0237 (KR);
A61B2017/0287 (KR);
A61B2017/3441 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/49] |
Former [2010/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtungen zur Bereitstellung des Zugangs in eine Körperhöhle | [2010/41] | English: | Devices for providing access into a body cavity | [2010/41] | French: | Dispositifs pour fournir un accès à une cavité corporelle | [2010/41] | Examination procedure | 21.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.10.2015 | Examination requested [2015/49] | 27.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/06] | 21.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.07.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP1312318 (UNIV MASSACHUSETTS [US], et al) [X] 1,6,7,16 * paragraph [0057]; figure 5 * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0061]; figures 7A, 7B * * paragraph [0062]; figure 8 * [A] 2-5,8-15; | [XA]IE20080453 (ATROPOS LTD [IE]) [X] 1,6,7,16 * page 9, line 12 - page 10, line 8; figures 4,5 * * page 11, line 20 - line 30; figure 6 * * page 12, line 8 - line 19; figures 11,12 * * page 13, line 6 - page 14, line 15; figures 15, 16, 17 * * sentence 24 * * page 15, line 30 - page 16, line 22; figures 26,27 * [A] 2-5,8-15 | by applicant | US2006247673 | US2004230161 | US20030687502 | US20090399482 | US20090399547 | US20090399625 | US20090399471 |