EP2238932 - Surgical access device having removable and replaceable components [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.11.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.12.2012 [2012/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | [2010/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Widenhouse, Christopher W. 1005 Arabian Run Drive Clarksville, OH 45113 / US | 02 /
Shelton IV., Frederick E. 245 East Main Street Hillsboro, OH 45133 / US | [2010/41] | Representative(s) | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/41] | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 10250733.2 | 08.04.2010 | [2010/41] | Priority number, date | US20090420202 | 08.04.2009 Original published format: US 420202 | [2010/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2238932 | Date: | 13.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2238932 | Date: | 07.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/34 | [2010/41] | CPC: |
A61B17/3423 (EP,US);
A61B17/3498 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00477 (EP,US);
A61B2017/3445 (EP,US);
A61B2017/3447 (EP,US);
A61B2017/3466 (EP,US);
A61B2017/3482 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Chirurgische Zugriffsvorrichtung mit abnehmbarer und austauschbarer Komponente | [2010/41] | English: | Surgical access device having removable and replaceable components | [2010/41] | French: | Dispositif d'accès chirurgical doté de composants amovibles et replaçables | [2010/41] | Examination procedure | 09.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/51] | 18.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2006110733 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-9 * paragraph [0181] - paragraph [0187]; figures "1-1", "1-5","1-7" * [I] 6; | [XI]GB2130889 (WOLF GMBH RICHARD) [X] 1-5,7,8 * page 1, line 125 - page 2, line 100; figure 5 * [I] 6,9; | [X]WO0217800 (GENZYME CORP [US]) [X] 1-8 * page 7, line 9 - page 9, line 19; figure 3 * | by applicant | US2006247673 | US20080242765 |