EP2273195 - Combustion furnace controller [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.12.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Azbil Corporation 2-7-3 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6419 / JP | For all designated states Chugai Ro Co., Ltd. 3-6-1 Hiranomachi Chuo-ku Osaka 541-0046 / JP | [2018/10] |
Former [2012/34] | For all designated states Azbil Corporation 2-7-3 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states Chugai Ro Co., Ltd. 3-6-1 Hiranomachi Chuo-ku Osaka 541-0046 / JP | |||
Former [2012/27] | For all designated states Azbil Corporation 2-7-3 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2011/02] | For all designated states Yamatake Corporation 2-7-3 Marunouchi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6419 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamada, Akira c/o Yamatake Corporation 2-7-3 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6419 / JP | 02 /
Kadoya, Satoshi c/o Yamatake Corporation 2-7-3 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6419 / JP | 03 /
Kumazawa, Yuuichi c/o Yamatake Corporation 2-7-3 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6419 / JP | 04 /
Morikawa, Katsumi c/o Yamatake Corporation 2-7-3 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6419 / JP | 05 /
Shirono, Hiroshi c/o Chugai Ro Co., Ltd. 3-6-1 Hiranomachi Chuo-ku Osaka 541-0046 / JP | 06 /
Zouta, Akio c/o Chugai Ro Co., Ltd. 3-6-1 Hiranomachi Chuo-ku Osaka 541-0046 / JP | [2012/40] |
Former [2011/02] | 01 /
Yamada, Akira c/o Yamatake Corporation 2-7-3 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6419 / JP | ||
02 /
Kadoya, Satoshi c/o Yamatake Corporation 2-7-3 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6419 / JP | |||
03 /
Kumazawa, Yuuichi c/o Yamatake Corporation 2-7-3 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6419 / JP | |||
04 /
Morikawa, Katsumi c/o Yamatake Corporation 2-7-3 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6419 / JP | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/10] | Lees, Gregory Alexander, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2011/02] | Tomlinson, Kerry John Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 10251059.1 | 08.06.2010 | [2011/02] | Priority number, date | JP20090138117 | 09.06.2009 Original published format: JP 2009138117 | [2011/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2273195 | Date: | 12.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2273195 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2273195 | Date: | 07.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F23N5/24 | [2011/02] | CPC: |
F23N5/242 (EP,US);
F23N2227/04 (EP,US);
F23N2227/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/10] |
Former [2011/02] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verbrennungsofensteuerung | [2011/02] | English: | Combustion furnace controller | [2011/02] | French: | Régulateur pour four de combustion | [2011/02] | Examination procedure | 16.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/35] | 25.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 04.12.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.07.2017 | Opposition(s) | 10.12.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.06.2010 | AL | 07.03.2018 | AT | 07.03.2018 | CY | 07.03.2018 | CZ | 07.03.2018 | DK | 07.03.2018 | EE | 07.03.2018 | ES | 07.03.2018 | FI | 07.03.2018 | HR | 07.03.2018 | LT | 07.03.2018 | LV | 07.03.2018 | MC | 07.03.2018 | MK | 07.03.2018 | NL | 07.03.2018 | PL | 07.03.2018 | RO | 07.03.2018 | SE | 07.03.2018 | SI | 07.03.2018 | SK | 07.03.2018 | SM | 07.03.2018 | TR | 07.03.2018 | BG | 07.06.2018 | NO | 07.06.2018 | GB | 08.06.2018 | GR | 08.06.2018 | IE | 08.06.2018 | LU | 08.06.2018 | MT | 08.06.2018 | BE | 30.06.2018 | CH | 30.06.2018 | FR | 30.06.2018 | LI | 30.06.2018 | IS | 07.07.2018 | PT | 09.07.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 08.06.2010 | |
AL | 07.03.2018 | ||
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
MK | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
TR | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GB | 08.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
IE | 08.06.2018 | ||
LU | 08.06.2018 | ||
MT | 08.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
FR | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 08.06.2010 | |
AL | 07.03.2018 | ||
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
TR | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GB | 08.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
IE | 08.06.2018 | ||
LU | 08.06.2018 | ||
MT | 08.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
FR | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
TR | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GB | 08.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
IE | 08.06.2018 | ||
LU | 08.06.2018 | ||
MT | 08.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
FR | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GB | 08.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
IE | 08.06.2018 | ||
LU | 08.06.2018 | ||
MT | 08.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
FR | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GB | 08.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
IE | 08.06.2018 | ||
LU | 08.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
FR | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GB | 08.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
IE | 08.06.2018 | ||
LU | 08.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
IE | 08.06.2018 | ||
LU | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
LU | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
PT | 09.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
AT | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
PL | 07.03.2018 | ||
RO | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | CY | 07.03.2018 | |
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
NL | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 07.03.2018 | |
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
SE | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 07.03.2018 | |
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
GR | 08.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 07.03.2018 | |
ES | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 07.03.2018 | |
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3849056 (SCHUSS J) [A] 1 * column 3, line 12 - column 11, line 28; figures 1-4 *; | [A]GB2082360 (ELECTRONICS CORP AMERICA) [A] 1 * page 1, line 95 - page 5, line 110; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US4015548 (SCHUSS JACK A) [A] 1 * column 3, line 55 - column 10, line 44; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2004176858 (KUWAHARA HIROKAZU [JP], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0056]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0233]; figures 5-14 * | by applicant | JPH11118150 | JPH10332143 |