EP2264338 - A compliant element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.2013 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolls-Royce PLC 65 Buckingham Gate London SW1E 6AT / GB | [2010/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Groom, Alec 55A Cecil Avenue St. George Bristol BS5 7SE / GB | [2012/34] |
Former [2010/51] | 01 /
Groom, Alec 55A Cecil Avenue St. George Bristol BS5 7SE / GB | Representative(s) | Little, Thomas Andrew, et al Rolls-Royce plc Intellectual Property Dept WH20 PO Box 3 Bristol South Gloucestershire BS34 7QE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/51] | Little, Thomas Andrew, et al Rolls-Royce plc Intellectual Property Dept WH20 PO Box 3 Bristol South Gloucestershire BS34 7QE / GB | Application number, filing date | 10251087.2 | 16.06.2010 | [2010/51] | Priority number, date | GB20090010536 | 18.06.2009 Original published format: GB 0910536 | [2010/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2264338 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2264338 | Date: | 22.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/08, F01D11/02 | [2010/51] | CPC: |
F16J15/0887 (EP,US);
F01D11/025 (EP,US);
F05D2250/70 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/51] | Title | German: | Nachgiebiges Element | [2010/51] | English: | A compliant element | [2010/51] | French: | Elément flexible | [2010/51] | Examination procedure | 03.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/24] | 16.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 01.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 23.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.06.2010 | AL | 22.08.2012 | AT | 22.08.2012 | BE | 22.08.2012 | CY | 22.08.2012 | CZ | 22.08.2012 | DK | 22.08.2012 | EE | 22.08.2012 | FI | 22.08.2012 | HR | 22.08.2012 | IT | 22.08.2012 | LT | 22.08.2012 | LV | 22.08.2012 | MC | 22.08.2012 | MK | 22.08.2012 | MT | 22.08.2012 | NL | 22.08.2012 | PL | 22.08.2012 | RO | 22.08.2012 | SE | 22.08.2012 | SI | 22.08.2012 | SK | 22.08.2012 | SM | 22.08.2012 | TR | 22.08.2012 | BG | 22.11.2012 | NO | 22.11.2012 | GR | 23.11.2012 | ES | 03.12.2012 | IS | 22.12.2012 | PT | 24.12.2012 | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 16.06.2010 | |
AT | 22.08.2012 | ||
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
IT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
MC | 22.08.2012 | ||
MK | 22.08.2012 | ||
MT | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
SM | 22.08.2012 | ||
TR | 22.08.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
IT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
MC | 22.08.2012 | ||
MK | 22.08.2012 | ||
MT | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
SM | 22.08.2012 | ||
TR | 22.08.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
IT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
MC | 22.08.2012 | ||
MT | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
SM | 22.08.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
IT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
MC | 22.08.2012 | ||
MT | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
IT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
MC | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CY | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
IT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
IT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
BG | 22.11.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
IT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
PL | 22.08.2012 | ||
RO | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
SK | 22.08.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
EE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
ES | 03.12.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
DK | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
NL | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
PT | 24.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
BE | 22.08.2012 | ||
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
SE | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
LV | 22.08.2012 | ||
SI | 22.08.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
GR | 23.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
HR | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
IS | 22.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
FI | 22.08.2012 | ||
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 22.08.2012 | |
LT | 22.08.2012 | ||
NO | 22.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 22.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2008106046 (DATTA AMITAVA [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,8-10 * paragraph [0058] * * figures 8B,22,23 * [I] 3,11; | [X]DE102007012302 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-5,8-11 * paragraphs [0032] , [0033] * * figures 2,3,5 *; | [XI]EP0472324 (SPECIALIST SEALING LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-5,8-11,14,15 * column 2, line 43 - column 3, line 20 * * column 4, lines 18-31 * * page 7, lines 21-24 * * figures 1,1A,2-10 * [I] 12,13; | [XI]GB2210939 (NICHOLSON TERENCE PETER [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,9-11 * page 3, line 22 - page 5, line 14 * * page 5, line 25 - page 6, line 8 * * figures 1-4,8,9 * [I] 3,14,15 |