EP2269684 - A medical guide wire, method of making the same, and assembly of balloon catheter and guiding catheter combined with the medical guide wire [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.06.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.07.2013 [2013/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PatentStra Co. Ltd. 4-10-13 Imahon-machi Anjo-shi Aichi 446-0008 / JP | [2011/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kato, Tomihisa c/o Patentstra Co., Ltd 4-10-13, Imahon-machi Anjo-shi, Aichi 446-0008 / JP | [2011/01] | Representative(s) | Hopkin, Tobias John Buxton J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/01] | Hopkin, Tobias J.B. J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10251171.4 | 29.06.2010 | [2011/01] | Priority number, date | JP20090158152 | 02.07.2009 Original published format: JP 2009158152 | [2011/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2269684 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/09, A61L31/02 | [2011/01] | CPC: |
A61L31/022 (EP,US);
A61M25/09 (EP,US);
A61M2025/09083 (EP,US);
A61M2025/09108 (EP,US);
A61M2025/09133 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Medizinischer Führungsdraht, Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung und Anordnung eines Ballonkatheters und Kombination aus Führungskatheter und medizinischen Führungsdraht | [2011/01] | English: | A medical guide wire, method of making the same, and assembly of balloon catheter and guiding catheter combined with the medical guide wire | [2011/01] | French: | Fil-guide médical, son procédé de fabrication, assemblage de cathéter à ballonnet et cathéter de guidage combiné au fil-guide médical | [2011/01] | Examination procedure | 17.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/30] | 03.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/28] | 07.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/28] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US2008171217 (MISHIMA KATSURO [JP]) [X] 1-4,6,10 * figures 1, 7 * * figure 3 * * figure 5b * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0074] * * paragraph [0079] * * paragraph [0083] - paragraph [0084] * * paragraph [0113] * * paragraph [0114] * * paragraph [0115] * * paragraph [0129] * * paragraph [0133] * [A] 5 [Y] 7-9; | [YA]US2005027214 (MURAYAMA HIRAKU [JP], et al) [Y] 7-9 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0073] * * paragraph [0074] * [A] 1-6,10; | [A]EP1685869 (ASAHI INTECC CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004167441 (REYNOLDS BRIAN R [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | by applicant | JPH0425024 | JPH10513081 | JP2006297152 |