EP2373123 - Method and structures of a miniaturised line lamp [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.06.2013 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.07.2013 [2013/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shao, Yi-Shing 6F, N°. 8, Lane 114, Heping Road Lujhou City Taipei County 24750 / TW | [2011/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2011/40] | Representative(s) | Whitaker, Iain Mark Alban Patent Agency Future Business Centre Kings Hedges Road Cambridge, Cambridgeshire, CB4 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/40] | Whitaker, Iain Mark Alban Patent Agency The Old Pump House 1a Stonecross St. Albans Hertfordshire AL1 4AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 10251368.6 | 30.07.2010 | [2011/40] | Priority number, date | CN201020135526U | 19.03.2010 Original published format: CN 201020135526 U | [2011/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2373123 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2373123 | Date: | 29.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H05B33/06 | [2011/40] | CPC: |
H05B33/06 (EP,US);
F21S4/10 (EP,US);
F21Y2115/10 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00013 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/00013, H01L2224/05099 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00013, H01L2224/05599 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00013, H01L2224/13099 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00013, H01L2224/13599 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Strukturen einer miniaturisierten Anruflampe | [2011/40] | English: | Method and structures of a miniaturised line lamp | [2011/40] | French: | Procédé et structure de voyant miniaturisé | [2011/40] | Examination procedure | 24.05.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]TWM364176U (CAI NAI-CHENG [TW]) [X] 1,14,15 * the whole document * [Y] 2-13; | US2010157598 [ ] (TSAI KENNETH [TW]) [ ] * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0028]; figures 1-5 *; | [Y]US2005231943 (SLOAN THOMAS C [US], et al) [Y] 2-13 * column 52 - column 54; figures 15-18 * | by applicant | TW200916620 | TW341145B |