EP2290530 - Widget framework [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.06.2013 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.07.2013 [2013/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bank of America Corporation 101 South Tryon Street Charlotte, NC 28255 / US | [2011/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Polakam, Sarabhaiah c/o Bank of America 101 S. Tyron Street Charlotte North Carolina 28255 / US | 02 /
Borges, Ashwin John c/o Bank of America 101 S. Tyron Street Charlotte North Carolina 28255 / US | [2011/09] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Robert Patrick Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/09] | Jackson, Robert Patrick Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 10251482.5 | 23.08.2010 | [2011/09] | Priority number, date | US20090236135P | 23.08.2009 Original published format: US 236135 P | US20100771238 | 30.04.2010 Original published format: US 771238 | [2011/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2290530 | Date: | 02.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/44 | [2011/09] | CPC: |
G06F8/38 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Widget-Rahmen | [2011/09] | English: | Widget framework | [2011/09] | French: | Cadre d'objets fenêtre | [2011/09] | Examination procedure | 02.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/42] | 18.06.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - Bradley, Angela, "Store PHP Code in a MySQL Database", (20080401), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20080401082803/http://php.about.com/od/phpwithmysql/qt/php_in_mysql.htm, (20101220), XP002615044 [I] 1-15 * page 1 * | [A] - www.phpeasystep.com, "PHP Login script tutorial", (20070915), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20070915191038/http://www.phpeasystep.com/phptu/6.html, (20101222), XP002615045 [A] 1-15 * page 1 - page 4 * |