EP2290540 - Dynamic configuration system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.11.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.12.2013 [2013/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bank of America Corporation 101 South Tryon Street Charlotte, NC 28255 / US | [2011/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Polakam, Sarabhaiah c/o Bank of America 101 S. Tyron Street Charlotte North Carolina 28255 / US | 02 /
Defer, Darin Michael c/o Bank of America 101 S. Tyron Street Charlotte North Carolina 28255 / US | 03 /
Lozes, John Andres c/o Bank of America 101 S. Tyron Street Charlotte North Carolina 28255 / US | 04 /
Moore, Christopher Alan c/o Bank of America 101 S. Tyron Street Charlotte North Carolina 28255 / US | 05 /
Tavormina, Peter Anthony c/o Bank of America 101 S. Tyron Street Charlotte North Carolina 28255 / US | 06 /
Huang, Ying c/o Bank of America 101 S. Tyron Street Charlotte North Carolina 28255 / US | [2011/09] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Robert Patrick Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/09] | Jackson, Robert Patrick Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 10251484.1 | 23.08.2010 | [2011/09] | Priority number, date | US20090236135P | 23.08.2009 Original published format: US 236135 P | US20100771807 | 30.04.2010 Original published format: US 771807 | [2011/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2290540 | Date: | 02.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/46 | [2011/09] | CPC: |
G06F9/542 (EP,US);
G06F2209/543 (EP,US);
G06F8/70 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Dynamisches Konfigurationssystem | [2011/09] | English: | Dynamic configuration system | [2011/09] | French: | Système de configuration dynamique | [2011/09] | Examination procedure | 02.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/41] | 20.11.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6751657 (ZOTHNER ERIC R [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 4 - column 26 * | [I] - Anonymous, "Reading from ini file and subscribing to Add/Edit/Delete events", (20090419), pages 1 - 32, URL: http://mycomponent.blogspot.com/2009/04/reading-from-ini-file-and-subscribing.html, (20110104), XP002615549 [I] 1-15 * page 31 * |