EP2292155 - Surgical instrument and loading Unit for use Therewith [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.05.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2012/52] |
Former [2011/10] | For all designated states Tyco Healthcare Group LP Suite 8 N-1 555 Long Wharf Drive New Haven, CT 06511 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Farascioni, David 30 Deepwood Drive Bethel, CT 06801 / US | 02 /
Kasvikis, Dino 8221 Town Brooke Middletown, CT 06457 / US | 03 /
Scirica, Paul A 264 Thompson Street Hintington, CT 06484 / US | 04 /
Racenet, Danyel 1390 Bartholomew Road Middletown, CT 06457 / US | 05 /
Robbins, Michael 1423 Quinnipiac Avenue Unit 208, New Haven, CT 06513 / US | [2021/43] |
Former [2011/10] | 01 /
Farascioni, David 30 Deepwood Drive Bethel, CT 06801 / US | ||
02 /
Kasvikis, Dino 8221 Town Brooke Middletown, CT 06457 / US | |||
03 /
Scirica, Paul A 264 Thompson Street Hintington, CT 06484 / US | |||
04 /
Racenet, Danyel 1390 Bartholomew Road Middletown, CT 06457 / US | |||
05 /
Robbins, Michael 1423 Quinnipiac Avenue Unit 208, New Haven, CT 06513 / US | Representative(s) | Soames, Candida Jane, et al Maschio & Soames IP Limited 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | [2021/43] |
Former [2011/45] | Soames, Candida Jane, et al Edwards Wildman Innovations LLP 10 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EZ / GB | ||
Former [2011/10] | Soames, Candida Jane EAPD Innovations 10 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10251545.9 | 02.09.2010 | [2011/10] | Priority number, date | US20090553174 | 03.09.2009 Original published format: US 553174 | [2011/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2292155 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2292155 | Date: | 22.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2292155 | Date: | 27.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/072, // A61B18/14, A61B17/00, A61B17/29 | [2014/04] | CPC: |
A61B17/07207 (EP,US);
A61B17/068 (US);
A61B17/072 (EP,US);
A61B17/115 (US);
A61B18/1442 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0023 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07214 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07221 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07235 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07242 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07278 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07285 (US);
|
Former IPC [2011/10] | A61B17/072 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/43] |
Former [2011/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Chirurgisches Instrument und Ladeeinheit zur Verwendung damit | [2011/10] | English: | Surgical instrument and loading Unit for use Therewith | [2011/10] | French: | Instrument chirurgical et unité de chargement correspondante | [2011/10] | Examination procedure | 02.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/33] | 24.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 13.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.05.2021 | 19.05.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 16.09.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.09.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.05.2018 | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/40] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 13.03.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 13.03.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.03.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 17.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 21.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.09.2010 | AL | 27.10.2021 | AT | 27.10.2021 | CY | 27.10.2021 | CZ | 27.10.2021 | DK | 27.10.2021 | EE | 27.10.2021 | ES | 27.10.2021 | FI | 27.10.2021 | HR | 27.10.2021 | IT | 27.10.2021 | LT | 27.10.2021 | LV | 27.10.2021 | MC | 27.10.2021 | MK | 27.10.2021 | MT | 27.10.2021 | NL | 27.10.2021 | PL | 27.10.2021 | RO | 27.10.2021 | SE | 27.10.2021 | SI | 27.10.2021 | SK | 27.10.2021 | SM | 27.10.2021 | BG | 27.01.2022 | NO | 27.01.2022 | GR | 28.01.2022 | IS | 27.02.2022 | PT | 28.02.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/27] | HU | 02.09.2010 | |
AL | 27.10.2021 | ||
AT | 27.10.2021 | ||
CY | 27.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
IT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
MK | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SI | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 02.09.2010 | |
AL | 27.10.2021 | ||
AT | 27.10.2021 | ||
CY | 27.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
IT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SI | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 02.09.2010 | |
AL | 27.10.2021 | ||
AT | 27.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
IT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SI | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 27.10.2021 | |
AT | 27.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
IT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SI | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 27.10.2021 | |
AT | 27.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SI | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 27.10.2021 | |
AT | 27.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SI | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 27.10.2021 | |
AT | 27.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 27.01.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5413268 (GREEN DAVID T [US], et al) [Y] 1-6,10,12-15 * column 27, line 47 - line 65 * * column 28, line 40 - line 52 * * column 31, line 56 - column 32, line 2 *; | [XI]EP1813209 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US]) [X] 1-6 * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0075]; figures 2,3,6,8 * [I] 12-15; | [Y]EP1915953 (TYCO HEALTHCARE [US]) [Y] 1-6,10,12-15 * the whole document *; | [APL]US2010072257 (FARASCIONI DAVID [US]) [AP] 1-15 * the whole document *[L] | Examination | US2008169328 | by applicant | US5752644 | US6953139 | US7237708 | US20030369894 |