EP2458780 - Cyclic data delivery using a multicast scheme [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.10.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Refusal of application | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states British Telecommunications Public Limited Company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | [2012/22] | Representative(s) | Chan, Robin, et al BT Intellectual Property Department Ground Floor BT Faraday Building 1 Knightrider Street London EC4V 5BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/22] | Chan, Robin, et al BT Group Legal Intellectual Property Department PP:C5A, BT Centre 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10252014.5 | 26.11.2010 | [2012/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2458780 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/18, H04L29/06 | [2012/22] | CPC: |
H04L12/1863 (EP);
H04L65/611 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Zyklische Datenlieferung über ein Multicast-Schema | [2012/22] | English: | Cyclic data delivery using a multicast scheme | [2012/22] | French: | Fourniture cyclique de données utilisant un schéma de multidiffusion | [2012/22] | Examination procedure | 02.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2012/47] | 12.07.2012 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/47] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6256673 (GAYMAN JASON A [US]) [Y] 1-8 * column 5, line 45 - column 10, line 27 *; | [A]US2008243924 (BARRETT TIM [CA], et al) [A] 1,5 * paragraphs [0072] - [0074]; figure 1.2 ** paragraphs [0100] - [0112]; figures 6,7 *; | [Y]US2009055880 (BATTERAM HAROLD [NL], et al) [Y] 1,5 * paragraphs [0023] - [0040]; figures 3,4 *; | [Y] - HYO-JIN PARK ET AL, "A Video-on-Demand Transmission Scheme for IPTV Service with Hybrid Mechanism", IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS, 2008 : ICC '08 ; 19 - 23 MAY 2008, BEIJING, CHINA, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080519), ISBN 978-1-4244-2075-9, pages 1777 - 1781, XP031265662 [Y] 1-8 * Chapters III-V * | [A] - SHOAF S ET AL, "Introduction to IGMP for IPTV Networks", INTERNET CITATION, (200606), URL: http://www.juniper.net/solutions/literature/white_papers/200188.pdf, (20070509), XP002432981 [A] 4,8 * pages 4-16 * | by applicant | US6256673 |