EP2299109 - Device for insulating hollow blades that work against the fluid current for a wind turbine or a water turbine with vertical axis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.03.2012 [2012/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Le Ster, Gerard 12 Rue des Deportes 29800 Landerneau / FR | [2011/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2011/12] | Application number, filing date | 10290329.1 | 16.06.2010 | [2011/12] | Priority number, date | deleted | [2011/49] |
Former [2011/12] | FR20090003200 | 29.06.2009 | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2299109 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F03D3/00, F03D11/00, F03B11/00, F03D3/04 | [2011/12] | CPC: |
F03D3/005 (EP);
F03D13/20 (EP,US);
F03B11/00 (EP);
F03D3/0472 (EP,US);
F03D80/00 (EP);
F05B2240/13 (EP);
F05B2240/216 (EP);
Y02E10/20 (EP);
Y02E10/728 (EP);
Y02E10/74 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung, die eine Isolierung der hohlen Laufradschaufeln ermöglicht, die den Fluidstrom für eine Windkraftanlage oder eine Wasserkraftanlage mit vertikaler Achse heraufziehen | [2011/12] | English: | Device for insulating hollow blades that work against the fluid current for a wind turbine or a water turbine with vertical axis | [2011/12] | French: | Dispositif pour réaliser un isolement des pales creuses qui remontent le courant du fluide pour une éolienne ou une hydrolienne à axe vertical | [2011/12] | Examination procedure | 22.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/13] | 08.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/13] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4019828 (BUNZER GEORGE J) [X] 1* figures 4,5 *; | [X]FR2442979 (VOUKOURAKOS CONSTANTIN) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]US4321005 (BLACK JERIMIAH B) [X] 1 * column 6, line 42 - line 47; figures 1-3 *; | [X]DE19648632 (BURGER HELMUT [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]WO0123757 (GUAY DENIS [CA]) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]US2007231118 (KRIPPENE BRETT C [US]) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]GB2451644 (DUONG HENRI [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * |