EP2398152 - Direct down conversion receiver and method of operation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.10.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL LUCENT 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [2014/34] |
Former [2013/48] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3, avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2012/08] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3 avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2011/51] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Martens, Hennig Gröninger Str. 46 71254 Ditzingen / DE | [2011/51] | Representative(s) | Wetzel, Emmanuelle Alcatel-Lucent Intellectual Property Business Group 70430 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/19] | Wetzel, Emmanuelle Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 70430 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2011/51] | Richardt Patentanwälte Wilhelmstraße 7 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 10290331.7 | 18.06.2010 | [2011/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2398152 | Date: | 21.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2398152 | Date: | 27.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/10, H04B1/30 | [2011/51] | CPC: |
H04B1/30 (EP);
H04B1/1036 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/51] | Title | German: | Direktabwärtungsmischungsempfänger und Betriebsverfahren | [2011/51] | English: | Direct down conversion receiver and method of operation | [2011/51] | French: | Récepteur à transposition directe par abaissement de fréquence et procédé de fonctionnement | [2011/51] | Examination procedure | 05.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.10.2011 | Examination requested [2011/51] | 22.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.07.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 09.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.03.2013 | Opposition(s) | 28.08.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | all designated states | Date: | 10.04.2013 | [2013/40] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.06.2010 | AL | 27.11.2013 | AT | 27.11.2013 | BE | 27.11.2013 | BG | 27.11.2013 | CY | 27.11.2013 | CZ | 27.11.2013 | DK | 27.11.2013 | EE | 27.11.2013 | ES | 27.11.2013 | FI | 27.11.2013 | HR | 27.11.2013 | IT | 27.11.2013 | LT | 27.11.2013 | LV | 27.11.2013 | MC | 27.11.2013 | MK | 27.11.2013 | MT | 27.11.2013 | NL | 27.11.2013 | PL | 27.11.2013 | RO | 27.11.2013 | SE | 27.11.2013 | SI | 27.11.2013 | SK | 27.11.2013 | SM | 27.11.2013 | TR | 27.11.2013 | NO | 27.02.2014 | GR | 28.02.2014 | IS | 27.03.2014 | PT | 27.03.2014 | IE | 18.06.2014 | LU | 18.06.2014 | CH | 30.06.2014 | LI | 30.06.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 18.06.2010 | |
AT | 27.11.2013 | ||
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
BG | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
IT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
MK | 27.11.2013 | ||
MT | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
SM | 27.11.2013 | ||
TR | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
GR | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
IE | 18.06.2014 | ||
LU | 18.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 18.06.2010 | |
AT | 27.11.2013 | ||
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
BG | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
IT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
MT | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
SM | 27.11.2013 | ||
TR | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
GR | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
IE | 18.06.2014 | ||
LU | 18.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 18.06.2010 | |
AT | 27.11.2013 | ||
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
BG | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
IT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
MT | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
SM | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
GR | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
IE | 18.06.2014 | ||
LU | 18.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
BG | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
IT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
MT | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
SM | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
GR | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
IE | 18.06.2014 | ||
LU | 18.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
IT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
MT | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
SM | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
IE | 18.06.2014 | ||
LU | 18.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
IT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
MT | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
IE | 18.06.2014 | ||
LU | 18.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
IT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
IE | 18.06.2014 | ||
LU | 18.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
IE | 18.06.2014 | ||
LU | 18.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
LU | 18.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SI | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
LU | 18.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
MC | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
LU | 18.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
DK | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
PL | 27.11.2013 | ||
RO | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
SK | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
EE | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
PT | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
BE | 27.11.2013 | ||
CY | 27.11.2013 | ||
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
LV | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 27.11.2013 | |
ES | 27.11.2013 | ||
FI | 27.11.2013 | ||
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 27.11.2013 | |
HR | 27.11.2013 | ||
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
IS | 27.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 27.11.2013 | |
LT | 27.11.2013 | ||
NL | 27.11.2013 | ||
SE | 27.11.2013 | ||
NO | 27.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 27.11.2013 | |
NO | 27.02.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2006141974 (CAMPBELL EDWARD E [US], et al) [X] 1-5,13-15 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0023]; figures 3-7 * [I] 6-12; | [XI]EP1858169 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [X] 1-5,13-15 * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0067]; figures 4-8 * [I] 6-12 |