EP2439547 - Systems, methods and devices for monitoring a capacitor bank [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schneider Electric USA, Inc. 1415 S. Roselle Road Palatine, Illinois 60067 / US | [2012/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tuckey, David T. 1233 Union Road Victoria, B.C. V8P 2J5 / CA | 02 /
Lupin, Jean-Marc 170 Impasse de l'Uche Pers-Jussy, 74930 / FR | [2012/15] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/15] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10290519.7 | 30.09.2010 | [2012/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2439547 | Date: | 11.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2439547 | Date: | 29.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/02, G01R19/25 | [2012/50] | CPC: |
G01R19/2513 (EP,US);
G01R31/2843 (US);
G01R31/64 (EP,US);
G06F15/00 (US)
|
Former IPC [2012/15] | G01R19/25, G01R31/01, H02H7/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/15] | Title | German: | Systeme, Verfahren und Vorrichtungen zur Überwachung einer Kondensatorbank | [2012/15] | English: | Systems, methods and devices for monitoring a capacitor bank | [2012/15] | French: | Systèmes, procédé et dispositif pour surveiller une batterie de condensateur | [2012/15] | Examination procedure | 11.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.10.2012 | Examination requested [2012/47] | 14.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.12.2012 | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.09.2010 | AL | 29.05.2013 | AT | 29.05.2013 | BE | 29.05.2013 | CY | 29.05.2013 | CZ | 29.05.2013 | DK | 29.05.2013 | EE | 29.05.2013 | FI | 29.05.2013 | HR | 29.05.2013 | IT | 29.05.2013 | LT | 29.05.2013 | LV | 29.05.2013 | MC | 29.05.2013 | MK | 29.05.2013 | MT | 29.05.2013 | NL | 29.05.2013 | PL | 29.05.2013 | RO | 29.05.2013 | SE | 29.05.2013 | SI | 29.05.2013 | SK | 29.05.2013 | SM | 29.05.2013 | TR | 29.05.2013 | BG | 29.08.2013 | NO | 29.08.2013 | GR | 30.08.2013 | IS | 29.09.2013 | IE | 30.09.2013 | LU | 30.09.2013 | PT | 30.09.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 30.09.2010 | |
AT | 29.05.2013 | ||
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CY | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
IT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
MC | 29.05.2013 | ||
MK | 29.05.2013 | ||
MT | 29.05.2013 | ||
NL | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
SM | 29.05.2013 | ||
TR | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
IE | 30.09.2013 | ||
LU | 30.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CY | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
IT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
MC | 29.05.2013 | ||
MK | 29.05.2013 | ||
MT | 29.05.2013 | ||
NL | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
SM | 29.05.2013 | ||
TR | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
IE | 30.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CY | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
IT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
MC | 29.05.2013 | ||
NL | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
SM | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
IE | 30.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
IT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
MC | 29.05.2013 | ||
NL | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
SM | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
IE | 30.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
IT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
MC | 29.05.2013 | ||
NL | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
IE | 30.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
IT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
MC | 29.05.2013 | ||
NL | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
IT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
NL | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
IT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
RO | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
SK | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
DK | 29.05.2013 | ||
EE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/06] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
BE | 29.05.2013 | ||
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
LV | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
PL | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
BG | 29.08.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
FI | 29.05.2013 | ||
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
SE | 29.05.2013 | ||
SI | 29.05.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
GR | 30.08.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 29.05.2013 | |
LT | 29.05.2013 | ||
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
IS | 29.09.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 29.05.2013 | |
NO | 29.08.2013 | ||
PT | 30.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US6671635 (FORTH J BRADFORD [CA], et al) [AD] 1-14 * claims 1-6 *; | [A]WO2007113769 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-14* claim 6 *; | [A]US2010169029 (BENNER CARL L [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0040] *; | [A] - MCCORMICK S R ET AL, "Capacitor bank predictive maintenance and problem identification using conventional power quality monitoring systems", POWER ENGINEERING SOCIETY GENERAL MEETING, 2004. IEEE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20040606), doi:10.1109/PES.2004.1373199, ISBN 978-0-7803-8465-1, pages 1847 - 1851, XP010756262 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PES.2004.1373199 | [A] - PEGGS J F ET AL, "Innovations for protection and control of high voltage capacitor banks on the Virginia power system", PROCEEDINGS OF THE POWER ENGINEERING SOCIETY TRANSMISSION AND DISTRIBUTION CONFERENCE. CHICAGO, APR. 10 - 15, 1994; [PROCEEDINGS OF THE POWER ENGINEERING SOCIETY TRANSMISSION AND DISTRIBUTION CONFERENCE], NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19940410), vol. -, doi:10.1109/TDC.1994.328393, ISBN 978-0-7803-1883-0, pages 284 - 290, XP010122156 [A] 1-14 * page 286 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TDC.1994.328393 | by applicant | US6671635 | US6687627 | US6792337 |