EP2322895 - Projectile body equipped with deployable control surfaces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nexter Munitions 13 Route de la Minière 78000 Versailles / FR | [2011/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Huguenin, Simon c/o NEXTER Systems Service PVD 7 route de Guerry 18023 Bourges Cedex / FR | 02 /
Roy, Richard c/o NEXTER Systems Service PVD 7 route de Guerry 18023 Bourges Cedex / FR | [2014/02] |
Former [2011/20] | 01 /
Huguenin, Simon c/o NEXTER Systems Service PVD 7 route de Guerry 18023 Bourges Cedex / FR | ||
02 /
Roy, Richard c/o NEXTER Systems Service PVD 7 route de Guerry 18023 Bourges Cedex / FR | Representative(s) | Célanie, Christian Cabinet Célanie 5 Avenue de Saint Cloud B.P. 214 78002 Versailles Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/02] | Célanie, Christian Cabinet Célanie 5 Avenue de Saint Cloud B.P. 214 78002 Versailles Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2011/20] | Célanie, Christian Cabinet Célanie 5 Avenue de Saint Cloud B.P. 214 78002 Versailles Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 10290609.6 | 15.11.2010 | [2011/20] | Priority number, date | FR20090005494 | 16.11.2009 Original published format: FR 0905494 | [2011/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2322895 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2322895 | Date: | 08.01.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F42B10/14, F42B10/50 | [2011/20] | CPC: |
F42B10/14 (EP,US);
F42B10/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/20] | Title | German: | Geschosskörper, der mit ausklappbaren Steuerflächen ausgestattet ist | [2011/20] | English: | Projectile body equipped with deployable control surfaces | [2011/20] | French: | Corps de projectile équipé de gouvernes déployables | [2011/20] | Examination procedure | 18.11.2011 | Examination requested [2011/52] | 28.12.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 06.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 09.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/51] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 09.01.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 09.01.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.01.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.11.2010 | AL | 08.01.2014 | AT | 08.01.2014 | BG | 08.01.2014 | CY | 08.01.2014 | CZ | 08.01.2014 | DK | 08.01.2014 | EE | 08.01.2014 | FI | 08.01.2014 | HR | 08.01.2014 | LT | 08.01.2014 | LV | 08.01.2014 | MC | 08.01.2014 | MK | 08.01.2014 | MT | 08.01.2014 | NL | 08.01.2014 | RO | 08.01.2014 | RS | 08.01.2014 | SI | 08.01.2014 | SK | 08.01.2014 | SM | 08.01.2014 | TR | 08.01.2014 | GR | 09.04.2014 | IS | 08.05.2014 | PT | 08.05.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 15.11.2010 | |
AT | 08.01.2014 | ||
BG | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
MK | 08.01.2014 | ||
MT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
SM | 08.01.2014 | ||
TR | 08.01.2014 | ||
GR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 15.11.2010 | |
AT | 08.01.2014 | ||
BG | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
MT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
SM | 08.01.2014 | ||
TR | 08.01.2014 | ||
GR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 15.11.2010 | |
AT | 08.01.2014 | ||
BG | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
SM | 08.01.2014 | ||
TR | 08.01.2014 | ||
GR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BG | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
SM | 08.01.2014 | ||
GR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
SM | 08.01.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RS | 08.01.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 08.01.2014 | |
IS | 08.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3432614 (RHEINMETALL GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,3 * abstract * * page 9 *; | [A]US4869442 (MILLER IRA E [US]) [A] 1,2 * figures 1,2 ** column 3, line 49 - column 4, line 2 *; | [XI]WO0179779 (BOFORS DEFENCE AB [SE], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * page 5, paragraph 1 - page 6, paragraph 1 * [I] 2; | [AD]WO2009051866 (HR TEXTRON INC [US], et al) [AD] 1,2 * abstract * * page 3, paragraph l - page 7, paragraph 3 * | by applicant | WO2009051866 |