EP2355453 - Quality parameters negotiation by specific URI [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2013 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3, avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | [2012/35] |
Former [2012/08] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3 avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2011/32] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Garcia Aranda, Jose Javier / AVDA. VIÑAGRANDE 19 2D 28925, MADRID / ES | [2012/35] |
Former [2011/32] | 01 /
Garcia Aranda, Jose Javier AVDA. VIÑAGRANDE 19 2D 28925, MADRID / ES | Representative(s) | Sciaux, Edmond, et al Alcatel-Lucent International 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/29] | Sciaux, Edmond, et al Alcatel-Lucent International Intellectual Property & Standards 32 Avenue Kléber 92700 Colombes / FR | ||
Former [2012/10] | Nicolle, Olivier, et al Alcatel-Lucent International 32, avenue Kléber 92700 Colombes / FR | ||
Former [2011/32] | Chaffraix, Sylvain, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 10305102.5 | 01.02.2010 | [2011/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2355453 | Date: | 10.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2355453 | Date: | 29.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30, H04L29/08, H04L12/56, H04L29/12 | [2012/18] | CPC: |
H04L47/724 (EP,US);
H04L65/40 (KR);
H04L69/24 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5603 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2011/32] | H04L29/08, H04L12/56, H04L29/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/32] | Title | German: | Qualitätsparameterverhandlung mittels eines spezifischen URIs | [2012/18] | English: | Quality parameters negotiation by specific URI | [2011/32] | French: | Négociation de paramètres de qualité par URI spécifique | [2011/32] |
Former [2011/32] | Qualitätsparameterverhandlung mittels spezifischem URI | Examination procedure | 29.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/12] | 12.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.04.2012 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.02.2010 | AT | 29.08.2012 | BE | 29.08.2012 | CY | 29.08.2012 | CZ | 29.08.2012 | DK | 29.08.2012 | EE | 29.08.2012 | FI | 29.08.2012 | HR | 29.08.2012 | IT | 29.08.2012 | LT | 29.08.2012 | LV | 29.08.2012 | MK | 29.08.2012 | MT | 29.08.2012 | NL | 29.08.2012 | PL | 29.08.2012 | RO | 29.08.2012 | SE | 29.08.2012 | SI | 29.08.2012 | SK | 29.08.2012 | SM | 29.08.2012 | TR | 29.08.2012 | BG | 29.11.2012 | NO | 29.11.2012 | GR | 30.11.2012 | ES | 10.12.2012 | IS | 29.12.2012 | PT | 31.12.2012 | IE | 01.02.2013 | LU | 01.02.2013 | MC | 28.02.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
IT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
MK | 29.08.2012 | ||
MT | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
SM | 29.08.2012 | ||
TR | 29.08.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
IE | 01.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
IT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
MT | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
SM | 29.08.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
IE | 01.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
IT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
MT | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
IE | 01.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
IT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
IE | 01.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
IT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/46] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
IT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
ES | 10.12.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
IT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
IT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
IT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
PL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
SE | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
HR | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
NO | 29.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 29.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9858474 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * figures 1,2,5a-5d * * page 5, line 14 - page 16, line 34 * * page 19, lines 9-30 * * page 21, line 26 - page 28, line 7 *; | [A]US2002069238 (EARD DOUGLAS F [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] - [0016] * * paragraphs [0023] - [0028] * * paragraphs [0035] - [0038] *; | [A]US2007005728 (ELBURY IAN [CA], et al) [A] 2* paragraph [0028] *; | [A] - K. LAKSHMAN, MADAN MANOHARAN, RAJ YAVATKAR, "Adding Realtime Applets and Quality of Service Support to the World Wide Web", ACM, 2 PENN PLAZA, SUITE 701 - NEW YORK USA, (19960101), pages 259 - 266, XP040132311 [A] 1-5 * abstract * * sections 1,2,5,6 * |