EP2360976 - A method for scheduling a mode for transmission, a base station and a user terminal therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.09.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL LUCENT 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [2014/34] |
Former [2013/44] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3, avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2012/08] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3 avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2011/34] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zeller, Dietrich Sternbergweg 4 71067 Sindelfingen / DE | 02 /
Braun, Volker Hasenbergstrasse 86 70176 Stuttgart / DE | 03 /
Doll, Mark Linzer Strasse 97 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [2013/44] |
Former [2011/34] | 01 /
Zeller, Dietrich Sternbergweg 4 71067 Sindelfingen / DE | ||
02 /
Braun, Volker Hasenbergstrasse 86 70176 Stuttgart / DE | |||
03 /
Doll, Mark Linzer Strasse 97 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Representative(s) | Kleinbub, Oliver, et al Alcatel-Lucent Deutschland AG Lorenzstr. 10 70435 Stuttgart / DE | [2011/34] | Application number, filing date | 10305149.6 | 15.02.2010 | [2011/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2360976 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2360976 | Date: | 30.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/02 | [2011/34] | CPC: |
H04W52/0206 (EP);
H04W88/08 (EP);
Y02D30/70 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/34] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Zeitplanung eines Modus zur Übertragung, Basisstation und Benutzerendgerät dafür | [2011/34] | English: | A method for scheduling a mode for transmission, a base station and a user terminal therefor | [2011/34] | French: | Procédé de programmation d'un mode de transmission, station de base et terminal utilisateur correspondant | [2011/34] | Examination procedure | 20.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/14] | 01.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.06.2012 | Opposition(s) | 31.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | all designated states | Date: | 10.04.2013 | [2013/40] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.02.2010 | AT | 30.10.2013 | BE | 30.10.2013 | BG | 30.10.2013 | CY | 30.10.2013 | CZ | 30.10.2013 | DK | 30.10.2013 | EE | 30.10.2013 | ES | 30.10.2013 | FI | 30.10.2013 | HR | 30.10.2013 | IT | 30.10.2013 | LT | 30.10.2013 | LV | 30.10.2013 | MC | 30.10.2013 | MK | 30.10.2013 | MT | 30.10.2013 | NL | 30.10.2013 | PL | 30.10.2013 | RO | 30.10.2013 | SE | 30.10.2013 | SI | 30.10.2013 | SK | 30.10.2013 | SM | 30.10.2013 | TR | 30.10.2013 | NO | 30.01.2014 | GR | 31.01.2014 | IE | 15.02.2014 | LU | 15.02.2014 | CH | 28.02.2014 | IS | 28.02.2014 | LI | 28.02.2014 | PT | 28.02.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 15.02.2010 | |
AT | 30.10.2013 | ||
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
BG | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
MT | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SI | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
SM | 30.10.2013 | ||
TR | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
GR | 31.01.2014 | ||
IE | 15.02.2014 | ||
LU | 15.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 15.02.2010 | |
AT | 30.10.2013 | ||
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
BG | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
MT | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SI | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
SM | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
GR | 31.01.2014 | ||
IE | 15.02.2014 | ||
LU | 15.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
BG | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
MT | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SI | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
SM | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
GR | 31.01.2014 | ||
IE | 15.02.2014 | ||
LU | 15.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
MT | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SI | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
SM | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
IE | 15.02.2014 | ||
LU | 15.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
MT | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SI | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
IE | 15.02.2014 | ||
LU | 15.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SI | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
IE | 15.02.2014 | ||
LU | 15.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
IE | 15.02.2014 | ||
LU | 15.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
LU | 15.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/44] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
LU | 15.02.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 30.10.2013 | |
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
HR | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 30.10.2013 | |
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
NO | 30.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 30.10.2013 | |
NO | 30.01.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2009140988 (NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS OY [FI], et al) [X] 1,3-9,13-15 * page 1, lines 6-8 * * page 1, lines 22-32 * * page 3, lines 11-19 * * page 7, line 31 - page 8, line 3 * * page 8, lines 13-32 * * page 10, lines 7-15 * * page 11, lines 18-24 * * page 12, line 11 - page 13, line 3 * * page 14, line 34 - page 15, line 2 * * page 21, line 14 - page 23, line 17 * [I] 10-12; | [XI]WO2004075583 (SWISSCOM AG [CH], et al) [X] 1,2,8-10,13-15 * abstract * * page 6, line 29 - page 7, line 16 * * page 7, lines 29-33 * * page 8, lines 19-28 * * page 9, lines 19-24 * * page 13, lines 2-7 * * page 14, line 13 - page 15, line 6 * [I] 3-7,11,12; | [X]US2010008276 (KOPIKARE MILIND [US], et al) [X] 1,2,9 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraphs [0007] - [0009] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraphs [0032] - [0034] * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraphs [0043] - [0050] *; | [X]DE102005051291 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,9-15 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraphs [0013] - [0015] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0020] *; | [X]WO2009077893 (NXP BV [NL], et al) [X] 1,9,13-15 * page 3, line 3 - page 4, line 22 * * page 5, lines 29-32 *; | [E]EP2154921 (NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS OY [FI]) [E] 1-5,7,9,13-15 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraphs [0010] - [0011] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraphs [0025] - [0046] * * paragraph [0069] * * paragraphs [0079] - [0080] * * paragraph [0086] *; | [E]EP2173135 (VODAFONE PLC [GB]) [E] 1-4,9,10,13-15 * paragraph [0010] * * paragraphs [0014] - [0017] * * paragraphs [0040] - [0043] * * paragraphs [0045] - [0049] * | Examination | EP2339882 | WO2011085238 | - ERICSSON ET AL, "Extended cell DTX for enhanced energy-efficient network operation", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-095011{ENERGY EFFICIENCY}, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20091109), no. Jeju; 20091109, XP050389361 |