EP2364776 - Catalyst coated honeycomb substrates and methods of using them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.08.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.09.2012 [2012/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corning Incorporated 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning, NY 14831 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2011/37] | For all designated states Corning Incorporated 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning NY 14831 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barthe, Philippe 30 rue Joseph Bail 77590, Bois le Roi / FR | [2011/37] | Representative(s) | Le Roux, Martine, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/37] | Le Roux, Martine, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 10305199.1 | 26.02.2010 | [2011/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2364776 | Date: | 14.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B01J35/04, B01J19/24, C01B3/40, C07C45/28, C07C45/36, C07C51/265, C10G45/32, C10G45/58 | [2011/37] | CPC: |
F01N3/2828 (EP,US);
B01J19/2485 (EP,US);
B01J21/063 (EP,US);
B01J23/22 (EP,US);
B01J35/56 (EP,US);
B01J37/0244 (EP,US);
C01B3/16 (EP,US);
C01B3/40 (EP,US);
C10G45/60 (EP,US);
C10G49/02 (EP,US);
B01J21/06 (EP,US);
B01J2219/2428 (EP,US);
B01J2219/2434 (EP,US);
B01J2219/2438 (EP,US);
B01J2219/2439 (EP,US);
B01J2219/2445 (EP,US);
B01J2219/2446 (EP,US);
C01B2203/1023 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Mit katalysatoren beschichtete wabenförmige Substrate und dessen Verwendungsverfahren | [2011/37] | English: | Catalyst coated honeycomb substrates and methods of using them | [2011/37] | French: | Substrats en nid d'abeille revêtus par un catalyseur et leurs procédés d'utilisation | [2011/37] | Examination procedure | 15.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/36] | 20.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3554929 (AARONS RALPH) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9500235 (ENGELHARD CORP [US]) [A] 1* page 18, line 35 - page 19, line 6 *; | [A]EP1598110 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0004] , [0007] , [0010] , [0024] , [0026] , [0055] *; | [Y]US2009120072 (DALLA BETTA RALPH ALBERT [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * paragraph [0061] *; | [IY]US2009215911 (WANG YONG [US], et al) [I] 1-4,8-14 * paragraphs [0009] , [0037] , [0038] , [0066] , [0067] * * claim - * [Y] 5-7; | [IY]WO2009134369 (CORNING INC [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * paragraphs [0003] - [0006] - [0030] , [0033] , [0037] , [0038] , [0042] - [0047] - [0052] , [0053] , [0080] * [Y] 1-14 |