EP2380456 - Rotatable cosmetic applicator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Albéa Services ZAC des Barbanniers 1 avenue du Général de Gaulle "Le Signac" 92230 Gennevilliers / FR | [2011/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Edmondson, M. Mark C/o ALCAN PACKAGING BEAUTY SERVICES ZAC des Barbanniers 1 avenue du Général de Gaulle 92230, Genevilliers / FR | 02 /
Kerman, M. Eric / 13 rue Jean-Baptiste Biot 51000, Chalon en Champagne / FR | 03 /
Seguin, M. Franck C/o ALCAN PACKAGING BEAUTY SERVICES ZAC des Barbanniers 1 avenue du Général de Gaulle 92230, Genevilliers / FR | 04 /
Dasilva, M. Eric C/o ALCAN PACKAGING BEAUTY SERVICES ZAC des Barbanniers 1 avenue du Général de Gaulle 92230, Genevilliers / FR | [2011/43] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2012/49] |
Former [2011/43] | Callon de Lamarck, Jean-Robert, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 20 rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 10305425.0 | 22.04.2010 | [2011/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2380456 | Date: | 26.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2380456 | Date: | 12.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A45D34/04, A45D40/26, A46B9/02, A46B11/00, A46B13/00, A46B13/04 | [2012/28] | CPC: |
A45D40/261 (EP,US);
A45D34/04 (EP,KR,US);
A45D40/26 (KR);
A45D40/262 (EP,US);
A46B11/00 (EP,US);
A46B11/0006 (EP,US);
A46B11/0068 (EP,US);
A46B13/001 (EP,US);
A46B13/04 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/43] | A45D34/04, A45D40/26, A46B9/02, A46B11/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/43] | Title | German: | Drehbarer Applikator für Kosmetika | [2011/43] | English: | Rotatable cosmetic applicator | [2011/43] | French: | Applicateur de cosmétique rotatif | [2011/43] | Examination procedure | 26.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/23] | 03.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 13.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.04.2010 | AT | 12.12.2012 | BE | 12.12.2012 | CY | 12.12.2012 | CZ | 12.12.2012 | DK | 12.12.2012 | EE | 12.12.2012 | FI | 12.12.2012 | HR | 12.12.2012 | IT | 12.12.2012 | LT | 12.12.2012 | LV | 12.12.2012 | MC | 12.12.2012 | MK | 12.12.2012 | MT | 12.12.2012 | NL | 12.12.2012 | PL | 12.12.2012 | RO | 12.12.2012 | SE | 12.12.2012 | SI | 12.12.2012 | SK | 12.12.2012 | SM | 12.12.2012 | TR | 12.12.2012 | BG | 12.03.2013 | NO | 12.03.2013 | GR | 13.03.2013 | ES | 23.03.2013 | IS | 12.04.2013 | PT | 12.04.2013 | IE | 22.04.2013 | LU | 22.04.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
BE | 12.12.2012 | ||
CY | 12.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
IT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
MC | 12.12.2012 | ||
MK | 12.12.2012 | ||
MT | 12.12.2012 | ||
NL | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
SM | 12.12.2012 | ||
TR | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
IE | 22.04.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
BE | 12.12.2012 | ||
CY | 12.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
IT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
MC | 12.12.2012 | ||
MT | 12.12.2012 | ||
NL | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
SM | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
IE | 22.04.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
BE | 12.12.2012 | ||
CY | 12.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
IT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
MC | 12.12.2012 | ||
MT | 12.12.2012 | ||
NL | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
IE | 22.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
BE | 12.12.2012 | ||
CY | 12.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
IT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
MC | 12.12.2012 | ||
NL | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
IE | 22.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
BE | 12.12.2012 | ||
CY | 12.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
IT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
MC | 12.12.2012 | ||
NL | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/01] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
BE | 12.12.2012 | ||
CY | 12.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
MC | 12.12.2012 | ||
NL | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
BE | 12.12.2012 | ||
CY | 12.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
NL | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
BE | 12.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
HR | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
NL | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
BE | 12.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
NL | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
BE | 12.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
NL | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
BE | 12.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
NL | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
BE | 12.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 12.12.2012 | |
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | BE | 12.12.2012 | |
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | BE | 12.12.2012 | |
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 12.12.2012 | |
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 12.12.2012 | |
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 12.12.2012 | |
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 12.12.2012 | |
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 12.12.2012 | |
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 12.12.2012 | |
NO | 12.03.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2005249541 (HABATJOU JACQUES [FR]) [X] 1,2,12,13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0012] , [0027] , [0029] - [0036] - [0047] , [0059] - [0102] * * figure - * [A] 3-11,14; | [XAI]US2163355 (SECHRIST PAUL A) [X] 1-5,12,14 * page 1; figure - * [A] 8-11,13 [I] 6,7; | [XA]US1853697 (OLIVER DEW R) [X] 1,2 * page 1, line 23 - page 2, line 90 * * figure - * [A] 10,11; | [XI]US5401113 (GUERET JEAN-LOUIS H [FR]) [X] 1,2,12,14 * column 1, line 33 - column 6, line 13 * * figure - * [I] 10,11; | [XAI]US2763882 (HENRY PLANKA) [X] 1-5,12,14 * page 1 * * figure - * [A] 7-11,13 [I] 6; | [A]CH184830 (KUPPER HUESLER MAX [CH]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US4535499 (CHO CHUN S [US]) [A] 1-14 * column 4, line 31 - column 7, line 36; figure - * |