EP2383286 - Methods and compositions for treatment of retinal degenerative diseases [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 24.02.2012 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2012 | Refusal of application | published on 28.03.2012 [2012/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSERM (Institut National de la Santé et de la Recherche Médicale) 101, rue de Tolbiac 75013 Paris / FR | [2011/44] | Representative(s) | Hirsch, Denise Marie Inserm-Transfert Industrial Property Department Biopark 7 rue Watt 75013 Paris / FR | [2011/44] | Application number, filing date | 10305464.9 | 30.04.2010 | [2011/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2383286 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/215, C07K14/47, A61K38/16, A61K38/17 | [2011/44] | CPC: |
C07K14/215 (EP);
C07K14/47 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Zusammensetzungen zur Behandlung von degenerativen Netzhauterkrankungen | [2011/44] | English: | Methods and compositions for treatment of retinal degenerative diseases | [2011/44] | French: | Procédés et compositions pour le traitement des maladies rétiniennes dégénératives | [2011/44] | Examination procedure | 10.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2012/13] | 11.11.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/13] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2009127705 (NOVARTIS FORSCHUNGSSTIFTUNG [CH], et al) [Y] 1-12 * claims 1,2 *; | [Y]WO2009146183 (GENZYME CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * claims 1-4 *; | [Y]WO2008148860 (INST NAT SANTE RECH MED [FR], et al) [Y] 1-12 * claims 1-12 *; | [Y]WO02081513 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [Y] 1-12 * claims 1,23-28 * | [Y] - GRADINARU V ET AL, "eNpHR: A Natronomonas halorhodopsin enhanced for optogenetic applications", BRAIN CELL BIOLOGY ; A JOURNAL OF CELLULAR NEUROBIOLOGY, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS-PLENUM PUBLISHERS, NE LNKD- DOI:10.1007/S11068-008-9027-6, vol. 36, no. 1-4, ISSN 1559-7113, (20080801), pages 129 - 139, (20080802), XP002557433 [Y] 1-12 * abstract * * page 130, column l, line 3 - column r, paragraph 1 * * page 133, column r, paragraph 2 - page 135, column l, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11068-008-9027-6 | by applicant | WO2009127705 | WO02081513 | WO2008148860 | WO9424983 | WO9011092 | US5185152 | US5710182 | US5443505 | US4853224 | US4997652 | US5554187 | US4863457 | US5098443 | US5725493 | US5378475 | - GRADINARU, V.; THOMPSON, K. R.; DEISSEROTH, K., "eNpHR: a Natronomonas halorhodopsin enhanced for optogenetic applications", BRAIN CELL BIOL, (2008), vol. 36, pages 129 - 39 | - WU Z; ASOKAN A; SAMULSKI RJ, "Adeno-associated virus serotypes: vector toolkit for human gene therapy", MOL THER, (2006), vol. 14, pages 316 - 327 | - CHOI VW; SAMULSKI RJ; MCCARTY DM, "Effects of adeno-associated virus DNA hairpin structure on recombination", J VIROL, (2005), vol. 79, pages 6801 - 6807 | - DINCULESCU ET AL., HUM GENE THER., (200506), vol. 16, no. 6, pages 649 - 63 | - LEBHERZ, C.; MAGUIRE, A.; TANG, W.; BENNETT, J.; WILSON, J. M., "Novel AAV serotypes for improved ocular gene transfer", J GENE MED, (2008), vol. 10, pages 375 - 82 | - PROC NATL ACAD SCI, (1993), vol. 84, pages 7413 - 7417 | - HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (1992), vol. 3, pages 147 - 154 | - PROC NATL ACAD SCI, (1990), vol. 87, pages 3410 - 3414 | - GENE THER., (20080313), vol. 15, no. 14, pages 1049 - 55 | - KOMAROMY AM; ALEXANDER JJ; COOPER AE; CHIODO VA; GLUSHAKOVA LG; ACLAND GM; HAUSWIRTH WW; AGUIRRE GD, "three photoreceptor specifc promoters (interphotoreceptor retinoid binding protein-IRPB 1783; guanylate cyclase activating protein 1-GCAP292; rhodopsin-mOP500)", MOL VIS., (20071018), vol. 13, pages 2001 - 11 | - SEMPLE-ROWLAND SL; ECCLES KS; HUMBERSTONE EJ, "the human rhodopsin kinase (RK) promoter", INVEST OPHTHALMOL VIS SCI., (200709), vol. 48, no. 9, pages 3954 - 61 | - KHANI SC; PAWLYK BS; BULGAKOV OV; KASPEREK E; YOUNG JE; ADAMIAN M; SUN X; SMITH AJ; ALI RR; LI T., "the promoter for the alpha subunit of cone transducin or the cone photoreceptor regulatory element 1 (CPRE-1) a novel 20-bp enhancer element in the TalphaC promoter", J BIOL CHEM., (20080418), vol. 283, no. 16, pages 10881 - 91 |