EP2390823 - Bank card with display screen [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.11.2012 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.12.2012 [2012/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gemalto SA 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/48] | For all designated states Gemalto SA Intellectual Property Dpt 6 Rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thill, Michel c/o Gemalto SA Intellectual Property Dept. 6 rue de la Verrerie 92197 Meudon Cedex / FR | 02 /
Gravez, Pierre c/o Gemalto SA Intellectual Property Dept 6 rue de la Verrerie 92197 Meudon cedex / FR | 03 /
Marseille, François-Xavier c/ Gemalto SA Intellectual Property Dept 6 rue de la Verrerie 92197 Meudon cedex / FR | [2011/48] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/48] | Application number, filing date | 10305571.1 | 31.05.2010 | [2011/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2390823 | Date: | 30.11.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/07, G06K19/073, // G06K19/077 | [2011/48] | CPC: |
G06K19/0716 (EP,US);
G06K19/07 (US);
G06K19/0723 (EP,US);
G06K19/07345 (EP,US);
G06K19/077 (EP,US);
G06K19/07703 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Bankkarte mit Displayanzeige | [2011/48] | English: | Bank card with display screen | [2011/48] | French: | Carte bancaire avec écran d'affichage | [2011/48] | Examination procedure | 31.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/50] | 06.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/50] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007290049 (RATCLIFFE WILLIAM R [US]) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [XI]US2009240625 (FAITH PATRICK L [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,11 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0055]; figures 1-6 * [I] 5,7-10; | [A]WO2010022129 (XCARD HOLDINGS LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0048]; figure 4 * |