EP2392857 - Oxy-fuel burner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.11.2012 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.12.2012 [2012/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Air Liquide Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | For all designated states L'Air Liquide Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2011/49] | For all designated states L'Air Liquide Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states Air Liquide America, LP 2700 Post Oak Blvd., Suite 1800 Houston, TX 77056 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kalcevic, Robert Entrée A2 84 Avenue de Paris 78000 Versailles / FR | 02 /
Belasse, Brenice 58 Route de Gallardon 28130 Maintenon / FR | 03 /
Chaillou, Dorothée 5 Mail Catalpas 78180 Montigny Le Bretonneux / FR | 04 /
Fujinuma, Ryuji 2-1, Nishi-Mikado 2-chome Kamakura-shi Kanagawa 248-0004 / JP | 05 /
Mulon, Jacques 1 Boulevard de la Paix 91300 Massy / FR | 06 /
Periasamy, Chendhil 23 Dynasty Drive Bear, DE 19701 / US | 07 /
Wang, Justin Jian 11 Celtic Street Bear, DE 19701 / US | [2011/49] | Representative(s) | De Vleeschauwer, Natalie Y.L.D. L'Air Liquide S.A. Direction Propriété Intellectuelle 75 Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/49] | De Vleeschauwer, Natalie Y.L.D. L'Air Liquide S.A. Direction de Propriété Intellectuelle 75 Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 10305606.5 | 07.06.2010 | [2011/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2392857 | Date: | 07.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F23M5/02, F23D14/32, F23L7/00 | [2011/49] | CPC: |
F23D14/32 (EP);
C03B7/065 (EP);
F23D14/22 (EP);
F23L7/007 (EP);
F23M5/025 (EP);
F23M2900/05021 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Sauerstoff-Brennstoff-Brenner | [2011/49] | English: | Oxy-fuel burner | [2011/49] | French: | Brûleur d'oxycarburants | [2011/49] | Examination procedure | 08.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/30] | 09.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/50] | 17.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2012/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0563792 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US], et al) [X] 7,8,10,11 * the whole document * [Y] 1-6,9,12-15; | [YA]US3748087 (SHULAR H) [Y] 2-6,12-15 * figure 1 * [A] 1,7; | [YA]US3861858 (HEMSATH KLAUS H, et al) [Y] 1,8-11 * figure 1 * [A] 7; | [Y]US3954433 (HOLLER ROBERT W) [Y] 8-11 * column 3, line 22 - column 8, line 13; figures 1-3 * | by applicant | EP0703410 | EP0216698 |