EP2399613 - Fractionation of plasma using caprylic acid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.11.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.12.2012 [2012/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Research Foundation For Medical Devices Rue Faucigny 5 1700 Fribourg / CH | [2011/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burnouf, Thierry 86 Rue Deleval 59249, AUBERS / FR | 02 /
El-Ekiaby, Magdy 64, Street 14, Maadi CAIRO / EG | 03 /
Goubran, Hadi Alphonse 73, Road 9 Maadi 11431, CAIRO / EG | 04 /
Radosevich, Miryana 86 rue Deleval 59249, AUBERS / FR | [2011/52] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/52] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 10305669.3 | 22.06.2010 | [2011/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2399613 | Date: | 28.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61L2/00, C07K16/06 | [2011/52] | CPC: |
C07K16/065 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Plasmafraktionierung mittels Verwendung der Caprylsäure | [2011/52] | English: | Fractionation of plasma using caprylic acid | [2011/52] | French: | Fractionnement plasmatique par l'acide caprylique | [2011/52] | Examination procedure | 29.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/51] | 06.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2005073252 (SUOMEN PUNAINEN RISTI VERIPALV [FI], et al) [I] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [I]WO2005082937 (OCTAPHARMA AG [CH], et al) [I] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [I] - HABEEB A F S A AND FRANCIS R D, "Preparation of human immunoglobuilin by caprylic acid precipitation", PREPARATIVE BIOCHEMISTRY, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19840101), vol. 14, no. 1, pages 1 - 17, XP002078264 [I] 1-8 * the whole document * | [I] - ROJAS G ET AL, "Caprylic acid fractionation of hyperimmune horse plasma: Description of a simple procedure for antivenom production", TOXICON, ELMSFORD, NY, US, vol. 32, no. 3, doi:10.1016/0041-0101(94)90087-6, ISSN 0041-0101, (19940301), pages 351 - 363, (19940301), XP023724234 [I] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0041-0101(94)90087-6 | [I] - RADOSEVICH M ET AL, "Intravenous immunoglobulin G: Trends in production methods, quality control and quality assurance", VOX SANGUINIS 2010 BLACKWELL PUBLISHING LTD GBR LNKD- DOI:10.1111/J.1423-0410.2009.01226.X, (201001), vol. 98, no. 1, ISSN 0042-9007, pages 12 - 28, XP009141581 [I] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1423-0410.2009.01226.x | [I] - STUCKI M ET AL, "Investigations of prion and virus safety of a new liquid IVIG product", BIOLOGICALS, ACADEMIC PRESS LTD., LONDON, GB, vol. 36, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.BIOLOGICALS.2008.01.004, ISSN 1045-1056, (20080701), pages 239 - 247, (20080312), XP022795227 [I] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biologicals.2008.01.004 | [I] - BURNOUF ET AL, "Modern Plasma Fractionation", TRANSFUSION MEDICINE REVIEWS, GRUNE AND STRATTON, ORLANDO, FL, US, (20070328), vol. 21, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.TMRV.2006.11.001, ISSN 0887-7963, pages 101 - 117, XP022020853 [I] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tmrv.2006.11.001 | [I] - BUCHACHER ANDREA ET AL, "Purification of intravenous immunoglobulin G from human plasma - aspects of yield and virus safety", BIOTECHNOLOGY JOURNAL, (200602), vol. 1, no. 2, ISSN 1860-6768, pages 148 - 163, XP009141576 [I] 1-8 * the whole document * | [I] - LEBING W ET AL, "PROPERTIES OF A NEW INTRAVENOUS IMMUNOGLOBULIN (IGIV-C, 10%) PRODUCED BY VIRUS INACTIVATION WITH CAPRYLATE AND COLUMN CHROMATOGRAPHY", VOX SANGUINIS, S. KARGER AG, BASEL, CH, (20030401), vol. 84, no. 3, doi:10.1046/J.1423-0410.2003.00285.X, ISSN 0042-9007, pages 193 - 201, XP001197282 [I] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1423-0410.2003.00285.x | [I] - DICHTELMUELLER H ET AL, "INACTIVATION OF LIPID ENVELOPED VIRUSES BY OCTANOIC ACID TREATMENT OF IMMUNOGLOBULIN SOLUTION", BIOLOGICALS, ACADEMIC PRESS LTD., LONDON, GB, (20020601), vol. 30, no. 2, doi:10.1006/BIOL.2002.0332, ISSN 1045-1056, pages 135 - 142, XP001149476 [I] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/biol.2002.0332 | [XA] - Biotest (UK) Ltd, "Zutectra", (20091130), pages 1 - 5, URL: http://www.medicines.org.uk/EMC/medicine/23193/SPC/Zutectra/, (20101208), XP002613316 [X] 8 * the whole document * [A] 1-7 | by applicant | US4481189 | US4540573 | WO2006082115 | - BURNOUF; RADOSEVICH, BLOOD REV, (2000), vol. 14, pages 94 - 110 | - TOUBI E; ETZIONI A, "Intravenous immunoglobulin in immunodeficiency states: state of the art", CLIN REV ALLERGY IMMUNOL., (2005), vol. 29, pages 167 - 72 | - KIVITY S; KATZ U; DANIEL N; NUSSINOVITCH U; PAPAGEORGIOU N; SHOENFELD Y, "Evidence for the use of intravenous immunoglobulins--a review of the literature", CLIN REV ALLERGY IMMUNOL., (2010), vol. 38, pages 201 - 69 | - BURNOUF T, "Modem plasma fractionation", TRANSFUS MED REV., (2007), vol. 21, pages 101 - 17 | - BURNOUF T, "Plasma fractionation in the world: Current status", TRANSFUS CLIN BIOL., (2007), vol. 14, pages 41 - 50 | - DODEL R; NEFF F; NOELKER C; PUL R; DU YS; BACHER M; OERTEL W, "Intravenous Immunoglobulins as a Treatment for Alzheimer's Disease Rationale and Current Evidence", DRUGS, (2010), vol. 70, pages 513 - 28 | - BURNOUF T, "Plasma fractionation in the world: Current status.", TRANSFUS CLIN BIOL., (2007), vol. 14, pages 41 - 50 | - HABEEB AF; FRANCIS RD, "Preparation of human immunoglobulin by caprylic acid precipitation", PREP BIOCHEM., (1984), vol. 14, pages 1 - 17 | - STEINBUCH M; AUDRAN R, "Isolation of IgG immunoglobulin from human plasma using caprylic acid", REV FR ETUD CLIN BIOL, (1969), vol. 14, pages 1054 - 8 | - PARKKINEN J; RAHOLA A; VON BONSDORFF L; TOLO H; TORMA E, "A modified caprylic acid method for manufacturing immunoglobulin G from human plasma with high yield and efficient virus clearance", VOX SANG, (2006), vol. 90, pages 97 - 104 | - LEBING W; REMINGTON KM; SCHREINER C; PAUL HI, "Properties of a new intravenous immunoglobulin (IGIV-C, 10%) produced by virus inactivation with caprylate and column chromatography", VOX SANG., (2003), vol. 84, pages 193 - 201 | - DICHTELMULLER H; RUDNICK D; KLOFT M, "Inactivation of lipid enveloped viruses by octanoic acid treatment of immunoglobulin solution", BIOLOGICALS, (2002), vol. 30, pages 135 - 42 | - ROJAS G; JIMENEZ JM; GUTIERREZ JM, "Caprylic acid fractionation of hyperimmune horse plasma: description of a simple procedure for antivenom production", TOXICON, (1994), vol. 32, pages 351 - 63 | - OTERO-PATINO RET, "A randomized, blinded, comparative trial of one pepsin-digested and two whole IgG antivenoms for Bothrops snake bites in Uraba, Colombia. The Regional Group on Antivenom Therapy Research (REGATHER)", AM J TROP MED HYG., (1998), vol. 58, pages 183 - 9 | - OTERO R ET AL., "A randomized blinded clinical trial of two antivenoms, prepared by caprylic acid or ammonium sulphate fractionation of IgG, in Bothrops and Porthidium snake bites in Colombia: correlation between safety and biochemical characteristics of antivenoms", TOXICON, (1999), vol. 37, pages 895 - 908 | - BURNOUF T; RADOSEVICH M, "Reducing the risk of infection from plasma products: Specific preventative strategies", BLOOD REV., (2000), vol. 14, pages 94 - 110 | - EL EKIABY M; LELIE N; ALLAIN JP, "Nucleic acid testing (NAT) in high prevalence-low resource settings", BIOLOGICALS, (2010), vol. 38, pages 59 - 64 | - BURNOUF T, "Radosevich M: Reducing the risk of infection from plasma products: Specific preventative strategies", BLOOD REV., (2000), vol. 14, pages 94 - 110 | - BURNOUF T; RADOSEVICH M, "Nanofiltration of plasma-derived biopharmaceutical products", HAEMOPHILIA, (2003), vol. 9, pages 24 - 37 |