EP2325514 - Method of controlling a clutch in creep mode of a vehicule [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.09.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.10.2013 [2013/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renault S.A.S. 13/15 Quai Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [2011/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Borsotto, Bastien La Cerisaie Bat 4 duplex n[deg]2 83300, DRAGUIGNAN / FR | 02 /
Zaoui, Kamal 4 square de la pierrefite 78120, RAMBOUILLET / FR | [2011/21] | Application number, filing date | 10306124.8 | 15.10.2010 | [2011/21] | Priority number, date | FR20090005634 | 24.11.2009 Original published format: FR 0905634 | [2011/21] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2325514 | Date: | 25.05.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F16D48/06, B60W30/18, F16D48/08 | [2012/51] | CPC: |
B60W30/18063 (EP);
F16D48/06 (EP);
B60W10/02 (EP);
B60W2510/0241 (EP);
B60W2520/10 (EP);
B60W2710/027 (EP);
F16D2500/10412 (EP);
F16D2500/1045 (EP);
F16D2500/1083 (EP);
F16D2500/30406 (EP);
F16D2500/3127 (EP);
F16D2500/50206 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2011/21] | F16D48/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Steuerung einer Kupplung im Kriechmodus eines Kraftfahrzeugs | [2011/21] | English: | Method of controlling a clutch in creep mode of a vehicule | [2011/21] | French: | Procédé de pilotage en mode rampage d'un embrayage de véhicule automobile | [2011/21] | Examination procedure | 17.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/30] | 06.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/41] | 22.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2013/41] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.12.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1342607 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1,11 * paragraphs [0038] , [0040]; figure 1 *; | [A]EP1605179 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1,11 * figures 2,3; claim - *; | [A]DE102007056884 (LUK LAMELLEN & KUPPLUNGSBAU [DE]) [A] 1,11 * figure 2 * |