EP2471476 - Bone anchor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.05.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.06.2013 [2013/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZIMMER SPINE 23, Parvis des Chartrons La Cité Mondiale 33000 Bordeaux / FR | [2012/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Larroque-Lahitette, Gilles / 9 Route de Maslacq 64150, LAGOR / FR | [2012/27] | Representative(s) | Besnard, Christophe Laurent, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2012/27] | Application number, filing date | 10306242.8 | 10.11.2010 | [2012/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2471476 | Date: | 04.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/70 | [2012/27] | CPC: |
A61B17/7047 (EP,US);
A61B17/7032 (EP,US);
A61B17/7056 (EP,US);
A61B17/7035 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Knochenanker | [2012/27] | English: | Bone anchor | [2012/27] | French: | Ancrage osseux | [2012/27] | Examination procedure | 01.03.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 08.04.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 05.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/26] | 12.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2007072459 (STAHURSKI TERRANCE [US], et al) [X] 1-3,8-11,14,15 * paragraphs [0030] - [0055] - [0070]; figures 1-4,11,14-17 * [I] 13; | [X]US2003045876 (STAHURSKI TERRANCE [US]) [X] 1,4-6,8-11 * the whole document *; | [X]US2007276384 (SPRATT FRANK [GB]) [X] 1,4,12-14 * paragraphs [0026] - [0031] - [0033] , [0034]; figures 1,3 *; | [X]US2003109882 (SHIRADO OSAMU [JP], et al) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US2003187437 (GINSBURG GLEN M [US]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * | by applicant | US4269178 | US2005023126 | US2007161990 |