EP2464089 - Diagnostic engine for determining global line characteristics of a DSL telecommunication line and method using same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent Site Nokia Paris Saclay Route de Villejust 91620 Nozay / FR | [2018/16] |
Former [2014/34] | For all designated states ALCATEL LUCENT 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2012/24] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3, avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dupuis, Nicolas Rue Henri Maus, 54 4000, Liege / BE | 02 /
Drooghaag, Benoît Rue de la Bouvrée 19 1421, Ophain-Bois-Seigneur-Isaac / BE | [2012/24] | Representative(s) | Nokia Bell Patent Attorneys Copernicuslaan 50 2018 Antwerp / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/16] | Lück, Stephan, et al Alcatel-Lucent Deutschland AG Intellectual Property Business Group Lorenzstraße 10 70435 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2012/24] | Narmon, Gisèle Marie Thérèse Alcatel-Lucent Bell NV Copernicuslaan 50 2018 Antwerpen / BE | Application number, filing date | 10306369.9 | 07.12.2010 | [2012/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2464089 | Date: | 13.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04M11/06, H04M3/30 | [2012/24] | CPC: |
H04B3/46 (EP,US);
H04M3/26 (US);
H04M3/306 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Diagnosemaschine zur Bestimmung der umfassenden Leitungseigenschaften einer DSL-Telekommunikationsleitung und Verfahren damit | [2012/24] | English: | Diagnostic engine for determining global line characteristics of a DSL telecommunication line and method using same | [2012/24] | French: | Moteur de diagnostic pour déterminer les caractéristiques globales de la ligne d'une ligne de télécommunications DSL et son procédé d'utilisation | [2012/24] | Examination procedure | 10.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/04] | 07.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/31] | 28.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.12.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | deleted | [2014/47] |
Former [2013/40] | ID: | 01 | |
For: | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | ||
Date: | 10.04.2013 | ||
[2014/47] | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2008048156 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [X] 1,4,6-8,11,13,14 * page 8, line 5 - line 8 * [Y] 2,3,5,9,10,12; | [Y] - ANONYMOUS, "SERIES G: TRANSMISSION SYSTEMS AND MEDIA, DIGITAL SYSTEMS AND NETWORKS, Digital sections and digital line system Access networks, Single-ended line testing for digital subscriber lines (DSL)", RECOMMENDATION ITU-T G.996.2, INTERNATIONAL TELECOMMUNICATION UNION, (20090501), pages 1 - 46, URL: www.catr.cn/radar/itut/201007/P020100707648582154399.pdf, (20110415), XP002633509 [Y] 2,3,5,9,10,12 * page 20 - page 34 * | Examination | WO2011015310 | EP2461170 |