EP2394932 - Capsule with weakened area [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Frydman, Alain 67, Rue de Courcelles 75008 Paris / FR | [2011/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2011/50] | Representative(s) | Blot, Philippe Robert Emile Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/23] | Blot, Philippe Robert Emile Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2011/50] | Blot, Philippe Robert Emile Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 10306436.6 | 16.12.2010 | [2011/50] | Priority number, date | FR20100054651 | 11.06.2010 Original published format: FR 1054651 | FR20100054652 | 11.06.2010 Original published format: FR 1054652 | FR20100054653 | 11.06.2010 Original published format: FR 1054653 | [2011/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2394932 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2394932 | Date: | 05.06.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B65D85/816 | [2012/34] | CPC: |
A47J31/3623 (EP,US);
B65D85/8049 (EP,US);
B65D85/8061 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/50] | B65D85/804 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/50] | Title | German: | Kapsel mit Anbruchzone | [2011/50] | English: | Capsule with weakened area | [2011/50] | French: | Capsule à zone d'amorce de rupture | [2011/50] | Examination procedure | 14.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/50] | 17.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2012 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 11.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.01.2012 | Opposition(s) | 06.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2012 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   12.04.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.12.2010 | AL | 05.06.2013 | AT | 05.06.2013 | CY | 05.06.2013 | DK | 05.06.2013 | EE | 05.06.2013 | FI | 05.06.2013 | HR | 05.06.2013 | LT | 05.06.2013 | LV | 05.06.2013 | MC | 05.06.2013 | MK | 05.06.2013 | MT | 05.06.2013 | RO | 05.06.2013 | RS | 05.06.2013 | SE | 05.06.2013 | SI | 05.06.2013 | SK | 05.06.2013 | SM | 05.06.2013 | BG | 05.09.2013 | NO | 05.09.2013 | GR | 06.09.2013 | IS | 05.10.2013 | PT | 07.10.2013 | IE | 16.12.2013 | LU | 16.12.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/41] | HU | 16.12.2010 | |
AT | 05.06.2013 | ||
CY | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
MK | 05.06.2013 | ||
MT | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
RS | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
SM | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
IE | 16.12.2013 | ||
LU | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 16.12.2010 | |
AT | 05.06.2013 | ||
CY | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
MK | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
RS | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
SM | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
IE | 16.12.2013 | ||
LU | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
CY | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
MK | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
RS | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
SM | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
IE | 16.12.2013 | ||
LU | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
CY | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
RS | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
SM | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
IE | 16.12.2013 | ||
LU | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
RS | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
SM | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
IE | 16.12.2013 | ||
LU | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
RS | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
IE | 16.12.2013 | ||
LU | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
RS | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
LU | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
RS | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
RS | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
RS | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
RS | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
RS | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
RS | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
RS | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
RS | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 05.06.2013 | |
NO | 05.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010064899 (AARDENBURG KEES [CH]) [A] 1-18 * paragraphs [0011] , [0047] , [0057] * * figures 10-13 *; | [A]FR2373999 (NESTLE SA [CH], et al) [A] 1-18 * page 1, line 22 - line 27 * * page 2, line 14 - line 18 * * page 3, line 12 - line 32 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO2009130311 (CENZE D ALMEZ S A [BE], et al) [A] 1-18 * page 10, line 29 - page 12, line 6 * * figure 2a * | Examination | WO2005066040 | EP2287090 | EP2284100 | EP1767467 | WO2009050540 | GB2023086 | FR2211924 | EP2210826 | by applicant | FR2373999 |